EP2308883 - New derivatives of thieno[2,3-b]pyridine and 5,6,7,8 tetrahydrothieno[2,3 b]quinoline in particular useful in the treatment of malaria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIJER, Laurent 16 rue de Bir-Hakeim 29680, ROSCOFF / FR | 02 /
KUNICK, Conrad Stremelkamp 48 A 21149, HAMBURG / DE | 03 /
BRANDT, Wiebke Maschplatz 4 38114, BRAUNSCHWEIG / DE | 04 /
DOERIG, Christian 14 rue de la Gare 1110, MORGES / CH | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Nony & Associés 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09172257.9 | 05.10.2009 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2308883 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, C07D495/14, A61K31/4365, A61K31/519, A61P33/06 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
C07D495/14 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neue Derivate aus Thieno[2,3-B]pyridin und 5,6,7,8 Tetrahydrothieno[2,3]chinolin, insbesondere nützlich zur Malariabehandlung | [2011/15] | English: | New derivatives of thieno[2,3-b]pyridine and 5,6,7,8 tetrahydrothieno[2,3 b]quinoline in particular useful in the treatment of malaria | [2011/15] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés de thiéno[2,3-b]pyridine et 5,6,7,8 tétrahydrothiéno[2,3 b]quinoline utiles en particulier pour le traitement du paludisme | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009163545 (GOLDFARB DAVID SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,4,9,12 * the whole document *; | [X] - MAY BARNABY C H ET AL, "Structure-Activity Relationship Study of Prion Inhibition by 2-Aminopyridine-3,5-dicarbonitrile-Based Compounds: Parallel Synthesis, Bioactivity, and in Vitro Pharmacokinetics", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (20070101), vol. 50, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 65 - 73, XP007907074 [X] 1-2,9,12 * Scheme 2; page 66 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm061045z | [ ] - "Supporting Information of: Structure-Activity Relationship Study of Prion Inhibition by 2-Aminopyridine-3,5-dicarbonitrile-Based Compounds: Parallel Synthesis, Bioactivity, and in Vitro Pharmacokinetics", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (20070101), vol. 50, no. 1, pages S1 - S11, XP002567547 [ ] * page S10 * | [X] - V. D. DYACHENKO, S. G. KRIVOKOLYSKO, YU. A. SHARANIN AND V. P. LITVINOV, "New method for the synthesis of 6-amino-4-aryl-3,5-dicyano-3,4-dihydropyridine-2(1H)-thiones by recyclization of 4-aryl-2,6-diamino-4H-thiopyranes", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS, (199707), vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1007/BF02253028, pages 793 - 798, XP002566749 [X] 1-3,9,11-12 * page 794; compounds VIIIh-k * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02253028 | [X] - "3,6-diamino-4-(2-thienyl)-thieno[2.3-b]pyridine-2,5-dicarbonitrile (RN: 717843-95-3)", CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20090707), Database accession no. 2080793508 CHEMCATS, URL: STN, XP002566750 [X] 1,4,8-9,12 * the whole document * | [ ] - Specs Compounds For Screening, SPECS, (20090707) [ ] * the whole document * | [X] - "[3-amino-4-(2-chlorophenyl)-5,6,7,8-tetrahydrothieno[2.3-b]quinolin-2-yl]phenylmethanone (RN: 573941-67-0)", CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20090706), Database accession no. 2094030527 CHEMCATS, URL: STN, XP002566751 [X] 1,6,9,12 * order Number: STOCK4S-13866 * | [ ] - Ambiter Stock Screening Collection, Ambiter, (20090706) [ ] * the whole document * | [X] - MATROSOVA S V ET AL, "Cyclization reactions of nitriles", RUSSIAN CHEMICAL BULLETIN, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US; RU, (19910701), vol. 40, no. 7, ISSN 1066-5285, pages 1456 - 1459, XP009128875 [X] 1-2,9,12 * page 1457; compound Xa * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00961252 | [X] - DYACHENKO AND A D DYACHENKO V D, "Synthesis of 4-Alkyl(aryl, hetaryl)-2-thioxo-5,6,7,8-tetrahydroquinol ine-3-carbonitriles and Their Derivatives by Cross-Recyclization of 4-Alkyl(aryl, hetaryl)-2,6-diamino-4Hthiopyran-3,5-dicarbonitriles with 4-(Cyclohex-1-en-1-yl)-morpholine, Alkyl Halides, and Cyclohexanone", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, CONSULTANTS BUREAU, US, vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 1070-4280, (20080301), pages 412 - 420, (20080418), XP009128897 [X] 1,11-12 * page 413; compound Xa * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11178-008-3017-0 | [X] - DYACHENKO V D ET AL, "Single Stage Synthesis of 2-Alkynylthio(seleno)-4-Hetaryl-3-Cyano-5,6 ,7,8-Tetrahydroquinolines", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS,, (19980101), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 1203 - 1208, XP002521011 [X] 1,9,12 * page 1203; compounds IXa,b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02290871 | [X] - YU A SHARANIN ET AL, "A NEW SYNTHESIS OF SUBSTITUTED PYRIDINE-2(1H)-THIONES AND HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS BASED ON THEM", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY OF THE USSR, M A I K NAUKA - INTERPERIODICA, RU, (19820901), vol. 18, no. 9, ISSN 0022-3271, pages 1760 - 1763, XP009128896 [X] 1,9,12 * page 1760; compound V * | [X] - "(3-amino-4-furan-2-yl-5,6,7,8-tetrahydrothieno[2.3-b]quinoline-2-yl)-phenylmethanone", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1984), XP002566959 [X] 1,9,12 * the whole document * | [ ] - ZHURNAL ORGANICHESKOI KHIMII, (1984), pages 1828 - 1837 | [X] - "(3-amino-4-furan-2-yl-5,6,7,8-tetrahydrothieno[2.3-b]quinoline-2-yl)-(4-fluorophenyl)-methanone", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1984), XP002566960 [X] 1,9,12 * the whole document * | [ ] - ZHURNAL ORGANICHESKOI KHIMII, (1984), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 2002 - 2011 | [X] - "(3-amino-4-furan-2-yl-5,6,7,8-tetrahydrothieno[2.3-b]quinoline-2-yl)-(4-chlorophenyl)-methanone", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1984), XP002566961 [X] 1,9,12 * the whole document * | [X] - "(3-amino-4-furan-2-yl-5,6,7,8-tetrahydrothieno[2.3-b]quinoline-2-yl)-(4-bromophenyl)-methanone", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1984), XP002566962 [X] 1,9,12 * the whole document * | [X] - "(3-amino-4-furan-2-yl-5,6,7,8-tetrahydrothieno[2.3-b]quinoline-2-yl)-(2,4-dimethylphenyl)-methanone", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (1984), XP002566963 [X] 1,9,12 * the whole document * | [AD] - SHARANIN Y ET AL, "CYCLIZATION REACTIONS OF NITRILES LIV.* SYNTHESIS AND PROPERTIES OF 6-AMINO-4-ARYL-3,5-DICYANOPYRIDIN-2(1H)-ONES, THE CORRESPONDING THIONES, THE PYRIDYLIDENEMALONONUTRIELES, AND THEIR HYDROGENATED ANALOGS", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, CONSULTANTS BUREAU, US, (19940101), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 1070-4280, pages 620 - 626, XP009128934 [AD] 1-10,12 * page 621; compounds XII (l), XIII (I) * | [A] - VANGAPANDU SUTYANARYANA ET AL, "Recent advances in antimalarial drug development", MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070101), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0198-6325, pages 65 - 107, XP009128888 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | - BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2004), vol. 1697, pages 181 - 196 | - RUSS. J. ORG. CHEM., (1994), vol. 30, pages 620 - 626 | - PRIMOT ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2000), vol. 20, pages 394 - 404 | - BAIN J ET AL., "The selectivity of protein kinase inhibitors: a further update", BIOCHEM J., (2007), vol. 408, pages 297 - 315 | - KARAMAN MW ET AL., "A quantitative analysis of kinase inhibitor selectivity", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200801), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 127 - 32 | - GARDNER, M.J. ET AL., "Genome sequence of the human malaria parasite Plasmodium falciparum.", NATURE, (2002), vol. 419, pages 498 - 511 | - CARLTON, J.M. ET AL., "Comparative genomics of the neglected human malaria parasite Plasmodium vivax", NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 799 - 803 | - PAIN, A. ET AL., "The genome of the simian and human malaria parasite Plasmodium knowlesi.", NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 799 - 803 | - QIN, C.L.; TANG, J.; KIM, K., "Cloning and in vitro expression of TPK3, a Toxoplasma gondii homologue of shaggy/glycogen synthase kinase-3 kinases", MOL. BIOCHEM. PARASITOL., (1998), vol. 93, pages 273 - 283 | - OJO, K.K. ET AL., "Glycogen synthse kinase 3 is a potential drug target for African trypanosomiasis.", ANTIMICROBIOL. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (2008), vol. 52, pages 3710 - 3717 |