EP2172599 - Light housing with frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizer Straße 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizer Strasse 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zipper, Rene Schweizer Str. 29a 6844 Altach / AT | 02 /
Bonat, Martin Kehlegg 102a 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 03 /
Krepl, Thomas Grändelweg 17d 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 04 /
Geißler, Walter Hofsteigstraße 1 6922 Wolfurt / AT | 05 /
Häfele, Gernot Reutegasse 3a 6900 Bregenz / AT | 06 /
Agron, Morina Badgasse 41a 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 07 /
Berktold, Markus Badgasse 16 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 08 /
Bösch, Karin Unter Hub 13b 6844 Altach / AT | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09172317.1 | 06.10.2009 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | DE20081050566 | 06.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008050566 | [2010/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2172599 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2172599 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/04, F21V15/01 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
E04B9/0428 (EP);
F21V15/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leuchtengehäuse mit Rahmen | [2010/14] | English: | Light housing with frame | [2010/14] | French: | Boîtier de lampe doté d'un cadre | [2010/14] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8305715U (RUDOLF ZIMMERMANN GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,5 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 25; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE3545513 (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1956419 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2008074877 (HSIEH HSIN-PO [TW]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE10145244 |