EP2143566 - Document folder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esselte Leitz GmbH & Co. KG Siemensstrasse 64 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seiffarth, Steffen Goethestrasse 41 70794, Stuttgart / DE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Reule, Hanspeter, et al Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/02] | Application number, filing date | 09172969.9 | 24.07.2007 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | DE20061037611 | 10.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037611 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143566 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B42F7/02 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
B42F7/02 (EP,US);
B42P2221/02 (EP,US);
B42P2241/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schriftguthülle | [2010/02] | English: | Document folder | [2010/02] | French: | Protège-documents | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07787856.9 / EP2049347 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2895448 (HAINES THERON L) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]DE1104488 (WALTER LENNARTZ) [AD] 1 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE1536654 (LENNARTZ WALTER) [AD] 1 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]AT280944B (HIRSCH HANS & SOEHNE) [AD] 1 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0142489 (HIRSCH KARL) [AD] 1 * page 4, lines 4-31; figures 1-7; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE1104488 | DE1536654 | AT280944B | EP0142489 |