EP2146435 - A/D converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dosho, Shiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Morie, Takashi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Matsukawa, Kazuo c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09173127.3 | 30.11.2007 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | JP20060327081 | 04.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006327081 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2146435 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2146435 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/12, // H03M1/46, H03M1/66 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
H03M1/46 (EP,US);
H03M1/1215 (EP,US);
H03M1/667 (EP,US);
H03M1/14 (EP,US);
H03M1/682 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/03] | H03M1/12, // H03M1/66 | Designated contracting states | [2010/22] |
Former [2010/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Analog-Digital-Wandler | [2010/03] | English: | A/D converter | [2010/03] | French: | Convertisseur A/N | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 14.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07832891.1 / EP2040382 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070832891) is 28.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JIREN YUAN ET AL, "A 10-BIT 5-MS/S SUCCESSIVE APPROXIMATION ADC CELL USED IN A 70/MS/SADC ARRAY IN 1.2-MUM CMOS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/4.297689, (19940801), vol. 29, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 866 - 872, XP000460908 [A] 1,2 * page 867, column l, lines 8-22; figures 1,3 * * page 867, column 1, lines 40-41 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.297689 | [A] - SUAREZ R ET AL, "An all-MOS charge-redistribution A/D conversion technique", IEEE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE - DIGEST OFTECHNICAL PAPERS, XX, XX, (19740915), vol. XVII, pages 194 - 195,248, XP003022243 [A] 1,2 * page 194, column l, line 10 - column r, line 23; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | JP2006325184 | - SAGARA, IWAO., AID D/A Henkan Kairo Nyumon (Introduction to A-to-D and D-to-A Converter Circuits), THE NIKKAN KOGYO SHIMBUN, LTD, (200303), pages 114 - 115 |