EP2189242 - Tool clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ott-Jakob Spanntechnik GmbH Industriestrasse 3-7 87663 Lengenwang / DE | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gast, Stephan Kaufbeurer Strasse 13 86987 Schwabsoien / DE | 02 /
Bonerz, Stefan Augsburger Strasse 17 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | 03 /
Bechteler, Wolfgang Bahnleite 2 87640 Ebenhofen / DE | [2011/50] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
Gast, Stephan Kaufbeurer Strasse 13 86987 Schwabsoien / DE | ||
02 /
Bonerz, Stefan Augsburger Strasse 17 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | |||
03 /
Bechteler, Wolfgang Bahnleite 2 87640 Ebenhofen / DE | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Charrier, Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Charrier, Rapp & Liebau Volkhartstrasse 7 86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09173157.0 | 15.10.2009 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | DE20081058185 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008058185 | [2010/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2189242 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2189242 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189242 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/00, B23B31/26 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
B23B31/265 (EP,US);
B23B2231/26 (EP,US);
Y10T279/12 (US);
Y10T409/104929 (US);
Y10T409/309408 (US);
Y10T409/309464 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | Werkzeugspannvorrichtung | [2010/21] | English: | Tool clamping device | [2010/21] | French: | Dispositif de serrage d'outil | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 14.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2009 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | HR | 14.12.2011 | IE | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | MK | 14.12.2011 | MT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | PL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | SM | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | NO | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 15.10.2009 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
SM | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
SM | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
NO | 14.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2952636 (WERKZEUGMASCH OKT VEB) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH048454 (MIYAGAWA KOGYO KK) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [XY]DE112004001389T (YIWON ENGINEERING INC [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0026] - [0036]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2; | [X]EP1938922 (VIGEL SPA [IT]) [X] 1,7* paragraphs [0001] - [0011]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE10043006 | DE102004051031 |