EP2180397 - Registration for interactive whiteboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promethean Limited Promethean House Lower Philips Road Blackburn Lancashire BB1 5TH / GB | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pearce, Nigel c/o Promethean Ltd Promethean House Lower Philips Road Blackburn Lancashire BB1 5TH / GB | 02 /
Painter, Paul c/o Promethean Ltd Promethean House Lower Philips Road Blackburn Lancashire BB1 5TH / GB | 03 /
Nelson, Lee c/o Promethean Ltd Promethean House Lower Philips Road Blackburn Lancashire BB1 5TH / GB | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09173678.5 | 21.10.2009 | [2010/17] | Priority number, date | GB20080019310 | 21.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0819310 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2180397 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2180397 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/038 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/04166 (US);
G06F3/0418 (EP,GB,US);
G06F3/0488 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Registrierung für interaktive Weißwandtafel | [2010/42] | English: | Registration for interactive whiteboard | [2010/17] | French: | Enregistrement pour tableau blanc interactif | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/17] | Registrierung für interaktive Weißtafel | ||
Former [2010/17] | Inscription pour tableau blanc interactif | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 15.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/41] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 03.08.2013 | ||
[2018/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001032057 (SMITH RANDALL G [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]CA2367864 (SMART TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [I] 1-15 * page 12, line 21 - page 14, line 5 * * figure 2 * * page 19, line 10 - page 21, line 8 * * figures 13a-13d *; | [I]EP1607853 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0066] * * figures 11-13 * |