EP2317206 - Illuminating device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liang Meng Plastic Share Co. Ltd. 166, Jun Shin Street Shuin City T'ai pei 238 / TW | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lai, Guang-Juh No. 166, Jun Shin Street 238, Shulin City, Taipei County / TW | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09174177.7 | 27.10.2009 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2317206 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F21K99/00, F21V31/00, // H01L25/075, H01L33/64, H01L33/54 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
F21V31/04 (EP,US);
F21K9/00 (EP,US);
F21V23/06 (EP);
F21Y2105/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2011/18] | English: | Illuminating device and method for manufacturing the same | [2011/18] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage et son procédé de fabrication | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 11.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3875456 (KANO TSUYOSHI, et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * figures 3, 5 * * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 14 *; | [X]JP2000252524 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS) [X] 1-2,6,9-12,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2008032142 (TASUMI KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-2,6,9-12,15 * figures 5,15 * * page 3, paragraph 79 - page 6, paragraph 144 * * page 10, paragraph 225 - paragraph 230 *; | [X]JP2007194675 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-14 * abstract * * figures 11-13 and the corresponding description *; | [X]EP1821030 (IDEALED S R L UNIPERSONALE [IT]) [X] 1-2,6,10-12 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE202004013308U (SAVAGE MARINE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 4/12, paragraph 20 - page 5/12, paragraph 26 * * figure 1 * |