EP2189390 - Safety case for precious stones, such as diamonds, pearls, coins, postage stamps and similar valuable articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAO "Golograficheskaya Industriya" D. 12 Per. Kalinina 220012 Minsk / BY | For all designated states Boboreko, Aleksandr Georgievich D. 82, kv. 48 Ul. D. Serdicha 220093 Minsk / BY | For all designated states Bocharov, Anatolij Mikhajlovich D. 32, kv. 17 Ul. Rylenkova 214031 Smolensk / RU | For all designated states Grakovich, Petr Nikolaevich d. 64, kv. 2 ul. G. Dimitrova 246047 Gomel / BY | For all designated states Gribovskij, Aleksandr Veslavovich d. 13, kv. 50 ul. Raduzhnaya 220020 Minsk / BY | For all designated states Ivanov, Leonid Fedorovich d. 18, kv. 6 ul. Yubilejnaya 246032 Gomel / BY | For all designated states Lushchikov, Mikhail Nikolaevich d. 20, k. 2, kv. 23 ul. Nekrasova 220040 Minsk / BY | For all designated states Moiseenko, Petr Vasil'evich d. 21, kv. 214 ul. Slobodskaya 220098 Minsk / BY | For all designated states Tanin, Leonid Viktorovich d. 32, kv. 65 ul. Gorodetskaya 220125 Minsk / BY | For all designated states Shevtsov, Viktor Arkad'evich d. 6, per. Agatovyj 220020 Minsk / BY | [2012/02] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states ZAO "Golograficheskaya Industriya" d. 12 Per. Kalinina 220012 Minsk / BY | ||
For all designated states Boboreko, Aleksandr Georgievich D. 82, kv. 48 Ul. D. Serdicha 220093 Minsk / RU | |||
For all designated states Bocharov, Anatolij Mikhajlovich d. 32, kv. 17 ul. Rylenkova 214031 Smolensk / BY | |||
For all designated states Grakovich, Petr Nikolaevich d. 64, kv. 2 ul. G. Dimitrova 246047 Gomel / BY | |||
For all designated states Gribovskij, Aleksandr Veslavovich d. 13, kv. 50 ul. Raduzhnaya 220020 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Ivanov, Leonid Fedorovich d. 18, kv. 6 ul. Yubilejnaya 246032 Gomel / BY | |||
For all designated states Lushchikov, Mikhail Nikolaevich d. 20, k. 2, kv. 23 ul. Nekrasova 220040 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Moiseenko, Petr Vasil'evich d. 21, kv. 214 ul. Slobodskaya 220098 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Tanin, Leonid Viktorovich d. 32, kv. 65 ul. Gorodetskaya 220125 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Shevtsov, Viktor Arkad'evich d. 6, per. Agatovyj 220020 Minsk / BY | |||
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states ZAO "Golograficheskaya Industriya" d. 12 Per. Kalinina 220012 Minsk / BY | ||
For all designated states Boboreko, Aleksandr Georgievich d. 82, kv. 48 ul. D. Serdicha 220093 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Bocharov, Anatolij Mikhajlovich d. 32, kv. 17 ul. Rylenkova 214031 Smolensk / BY | |||
For all designated states Grakovich, Petr Nikolaevich d. 64, kv. 2 ul. G. Dimitrova 246047 Gomel / BY | |||
For all designated states Gribovskij, Aleksandr Veslavovich d. 13, kv. 50 ul. Raduzhnaya 220020 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Ivanov, Leonid Fedorovich d. 18, kv. 6 ul. Yubilejnaya 246032 Gomel / BY | |||
For all designated states Lushchikov, Mikhail Nikolaevich d. 20, k. 2, kv. 23 ul. Nekrasova 220040 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Moiseenko, Petr Vasil'evich d. 21, kv. 214 ul. Slobodskaya 220098 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Tanin, Leonid Viktorovich d. 32, kv. 65 ul. Gorodetskaya 220125 Minsk / BY | |||
For all designated states Shevtsov, Viktor Arkad'evich d. 6, per. agatovyj 220020 Minsk / BY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boboreko, Aleksandr Georgievich d. 82, kv. 48 ul. D. Serdicha 220093 Minsk / BY | 02 /
Bocharov, Anatolij Mikhajlovich d. 32, kv. 17 ul. Rylenkova 214031 Smolensk / RU | 03 /
Grakovich, Petr Nikolaevich d. 64, kv. 2 ul. G. Dimitrova 246047 Gomel / BY | 04 /
Gribovskij, Aleksandr Veslavovich d. 13, kv. 50 ul. Raduzhnaya 220020 Minsk / BY | 05 /
Ivanov, Leonid Fedorovich d. 18, kv. 6 ul. Yubilejnaya 246032 Gomel / BY | 06 /
Lushchikov, Mikhail Nikolaevich d. 20, k. 2, kv. 23 ul. Nekrasova 220040 Minsk / BY | 07 /
Moiseenko, Petr Vasil'evich d. 21, kv. 214 ul. Slobodskaya 220098 Minsk / BY | 08 /
Tanin, Leonid Viktorovich d. 32, kv. 65 ul. Gorodetskaya 220125 Minsk / BY | 09 /
Shevtsov, Viktor Arkad'evich / d. 6, per. Agatovyj 220020 Minsk / BY | [2011/50] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
Boboreko, Aleksandr Georgievich d. 82, kv. 48 ul. D. Serdicha 220093 Minsk / BY | ||
02 /
Bocharov, Anatolij Mikhajlovich d. 32, kv. 17 ul. Rylenkova 214031 Smolensk / RU | |||
03 /
Grakovich, Petr Nikolaevich d. 64, kv. 2 ul. G. Dimitrova 246047 Gomel / BY | |||
04 /
Gribovskij, Aleksandr Veslavovich d. 13, kv. 50 ul. Raduzhnaya 220020 Minsk / BY | |||
05 /
Ivanov, Leonid Fedorovich d. 18, kv. 6 ul. Yubilejnaya 246032 Gomel / BY | |||
06 /
Lushchikov, Mikhail Nikolaevich d. 20, k. 2, kv. 23 ul. Nekrasova 220040 Minsk / BY | |||
07 /
Moiseenko, Petr Vasil'evich d. 21, kv. 214 ul. Slobodskaya 220098 Minsk / BY | |||
08 /
Tanin, Leonid Viktorovich d. 32, kv. 65 ul. Gorodetskaya 220125 Minsk / BY | |||
09 /
Shevtsov, Viktor Arkad'evich d. 6, per. Agatovyj 220020 Minsk / BY | Representative(s) | Sloboshanin, Sergej, et al V. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Hano Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2010/21] | Application number, filing date | 09174311.2 | 28.10.2009 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | EA20090000121 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: EA 200900121 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2189390 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189390 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2189390 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/36 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
B65D75/366 (EP);
G09F3/0292 (EP);
G09F3/0341 (EP);
A45C11/16 (EP);
A45C13/18 (EP);
B65D2203/02 (EP);
B65D2401/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | B65D75/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsbehälter für Edelsteine, wie Diamanten, sowie für Perlen, Münzen, Briefmarken und ähnliche wertvolle Artikel | [2011/25] | English: | Safety case for precious stones, such as diamonds, pearls, coins, postage stamps and similar valuable articles | [2010/21] | French: | Étui de sécurité pour pierres précieuses, telles que des diamants, des perles, des pièces de monnaie, des timbres-poste et articles de valeur similaires | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/21] | Sicherheitsbehälter für Edelsteine, wie etwa Diamanten, sowie für Perlen, Münzen, Briefmarken und ähnliche wertvolle Artikel | ||
Former [2010/21] | Étui de sécurité pour pierres précieuses, telles des diamants, des perles, des pièces de monnaie, des timbres-poste et articles de valeur similaires | Examination procedure | 08.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 14.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2009 | AT | 14.12.2011 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | HR | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | MK | 14.12.2011 | MT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | PL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | SM | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | NO | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 28.10.2009 | |
AT | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
SM | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
SM | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
NO | 14.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0345405 (ARYSEARCH ARYLAN AG [LI]) [AD] 1-6 * column 7, line 38 - column 9, line 3 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CH673562 (ARYSEARCH ARYLAN AG) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]US2006138009 (BOZKURT NACI [TR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-8 * |