EP2182206 - Hydraulic sytem and wind turbine generator provided therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomaguchi, Hiroyuki c/o NAGASAKI Research & Development Center Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken 8510392 / JP | 02 /
Yuge, Atsushi c/o NAGASAKI Research & Development Center Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken 8510392 / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Toshikazu c/o NAGASAKI Research & Development Center Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken 8510392 / JP | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09174364.1 | 28.10.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | JP20080278823 | 29.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008278823 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2182206 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D9/00, F03D9/02 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
F03D7/02 (EP,US);
F03D9/00 (EP);
F03D9/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y02E70/30 (EP);
Y02P80/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hydraulisches System und Windturbinengenerator damit | [2010/18] | English: | Hydraulic sytem and wind turbine generator provided therewith | [2010/18] | French: | Système hydraulique et générateur de turbine d'éolienne fourni avec celui-ci | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |