EP2183960 - Greenhouse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Einhell Germany AG Wiesenweg 22 94405 Landau / Isar / DE | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kagerer, Ulrich Alois Osterfeld 22 94431, Pilsting/Oberndorf / DE | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Benninger, Johannes Benninger & Eichler-Stahlberg Patentanwälte Dechbettener Strasse 10 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/19] | Benninger, Johannes Reichert & Benninger Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09174570.3 | 30.10.2009 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | DE20082013767U | 10.11.2008 Original published format: DE 202008013767 U | [2010/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2183960 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/16, E05B53/00 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
A01G9/14 (EP);
A01G9/16 (EP);
E05B53/003 (EP);
E05B65/0876 (EP);
E05C17/60 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gewächshaus | [2010/19] | English: | Greenhouse | [2010/19] | French: | Serre | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 08.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/44] | 10.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]GB791574 (GEORGE EDWARD BRIGHTWELL) [I] 1-6 * page 1, line 9 - line 18 * * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 71; figures 1-10 * [Y] 7-14; | [Y]US2006137832 (ALEXANDER HOWARD [US]) [Y] 7-14 * paragraph [0022]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0307385 (AUSTRIA METALL [AT]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |