EP2316998 - Washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 N. M 63 Benton Harbor, 49022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 N. M 63 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marzi, Stefano Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | [2015/27] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Marzi, Stefano Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | ||
Former [2011/18] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 09174649.5 | 30.10.2009 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316998 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2316998 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/26, D06F39/14 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
D06F39/14 (EP,US);
D06F37/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2011/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Waschmaschine | [2011/18] | English: | Washing machine | [2011/18] | French: | Machine à laver | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | MT | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IE | 30.10.2015 | LU | 30.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1367169 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8,9,11 * figures 1,10,11 *; | [A]EP1408150 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8,9,11 * figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]JP2005279181 (HITACHI HOME & LIFE SOLUTIONS) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]JP2005205194 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE102005042441 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | EP1367169 | EP20090152750 |