EP2192245 - Tower for a wind turbine and a method for assembling the tower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2011/50] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Alsvej 21 8940 Randers - SV / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kristensen, Jonas / Birk Skovpark 18 6900 Skjern / DK | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
Kristensen, Jonas Birk Skovpark 18 6900 Skjern / DK | Representative(s) | Larsson, Malin Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/22] | Larsson, Malin Awapatent AB Box 1066 S-251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 09175409.3 | 09.11.2009 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | DK20080001671 | 27.11.2008 Original published format: DK 200801671 | US20080118680P | 01.12.2008 Original published format: US 118680 P | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2192245 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2192245 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/58, F03D11/04, F16L23/036 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
E04H12/085 (EP,US);
B25B13/02 (EP,US);
B25B13/485 (EP,US);
E02D27/42 (EP,US);
E02D27/425 (EP,US);
F03D13/22 (US);
F03D80/00 (EP,US);
F16B23/0069 (EP,US);
F05B2240/912 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | Turm für eine Windturbine und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2010/22] | English: | Tower for a wind turbine and a method for assembling the tower | [2010/22] | French: | Tour d'une turbine aeolienne et procédée de assemblage du tour | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2009 | AT | 30.05.2012 | BE | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | IT | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MK | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | NL | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SE | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | SM | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | IE | 09.11.2012 | LU | 09.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 09.11.2009 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
SM | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
LU | 09.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
SM | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
LU | 09.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005072067 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0068]; figures 7,13 *; | [AP]JP2008308945 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD, et al) [AP] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE102005052419 (RHEINAUER MASCHINEN & ARMATURE [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *; | [A]US3843764 (GRAWEY C, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10223429 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006000185 |