EP2186906 - Medium for detecting and differentiating vancomycin-resistant enterococci [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXOID LIMITED Wade Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8PW / GB | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Dagmara c/o Oxoid Ltd Wade Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8PW / GB | 02 /
Dimmer, Stephen c/o Oxoid Ltd Wade Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8PW / GB | [2012/30] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
Klein, Dagmara c/o Oxoid Ltd Wade Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8PW / GB | ||
02 /
Dimmer, Stephen c/o Oxoid Ltd Wade Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8PW / GB | Representative(s) | Maughan, Sophie Louise, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Maughan, Sophie Louise, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09175436.6 | 09.11.2009 | [2010/20] | Priority number, date | GB20080020398 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: GB 0820398 | GB20080022764 | 15.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0822764 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2186906 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2186906 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186906 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C12Q1/045 (EP,GB,US);
C12N1/20 (GB,US);
G01N33/56916 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | Medium zum Erkennen und Unterscheiden von vancomycin-resistenten Enterokokken | [2010/20] | English: | Medium for detecting and differentiating vancomycin-resistant enterococci | [2010/20] | French: | Support pour détecter et différentier les enterocoques résistant à la vancomycine | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2009 | AT | 25.07.2012 | BE | 25.07.2012 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | HR | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | MK | 25.07.2012 | MT | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | PL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | SM | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | NO | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | IE | 09.11.2012 | LU | 09.11.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 09.11.2009 | |
AT | 25.07.2012 | ||
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
SM | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
LU | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
SM | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
LU | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5536645 (JAY CORINNE [FR]); | [A]US5786167 (TUOMPO HELENA [FI], et al); | by applicant | US5534415 | US5620865 | US5635367 | US5846761 | US5962251 | US6165743 | US6355449 | US6905841 | US7217536 | US7351548 |