EP2189143 - Dental delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dental Equipment LLC d/b/a Pelton & Crane Company 11727 Fruehauf Drive Charlotte, North Carolina NC 28273 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Dental Equipment LLC d/b/a Pelton & Crane Company 11727 Fruehauf Drive Charlotte, North Carolina NC 28273 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junge, Nilton Albano Rua Chapecó n. 86 Saguaçu 89221-040, Joinville, Santa Catarina / BR | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Papa, Elisabetta, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Papa, Elisabetta, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 09175561.1 | 10.11.2009 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | US20080117210P | 23.11.2008 Original published format: US 117210 P | US20090404382 | 16.03.2009 Original published format: US 404382 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2189143 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189143 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61G15/16 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
A61G15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | Dentales Abgabesystem | [2010/21] | English: | Dental delivery system | [2010/21] | French: | Système d'administration dentaire | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 25.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HR | 24.08.2011 | HU | 24.08.2011 | IT | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | MK | 24.08.2011 | MT | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | SM | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | IE | 10.11.2011 | LU | 10.11.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | NO | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
SM | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
LU | 10.11.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
SM | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
LU | 10.11.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
SM | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
LU | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
SM | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4114273 (MCGAHA GEORGE VERNON) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE2849035 (RITTER AG) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4345616 (TERRY PAUL V) [A] 1 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 10; figure 5 *; | [XP]JP2009039406 (OSADA RES INST LTD) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * |