EP2184725 - Emergency service warning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phyco Trading B.V. Arkerweg 2 3861 NH Nijkerk / NL | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rijks, Johan / Zuidergracht 21 3763 LS, Soest / NL | [2013/43] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
Rijks, Johan Zuidergracht 21 3763 LS, Soest / NL | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2013/43] |
Former [2010/19] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09175717.9 | 11.11.2009 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | NL20082002201 | 11.11.2008 Original published format: NL 2002201 | [2010/19] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184725 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184725 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/22, H04W76/00, G08G1/0965 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
G08G1/0965 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | G08G1/0965 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | Notfalldienst-Warnsystem | [2010/19] | English: | Emergency service warning system | [2010/19] | French: | Système d'avertissement d'un service d'urgence | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MK | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | SM | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MK | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4241326 (ODOM WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-14,16 * column 3, line 39 - line 44 * * column 4, line 54 - column 18, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0942402 (FEDERAL SIGNAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6160493 (SMITH EUGENE T [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]DE10053099 (CAA AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-10,13-16 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055]; figures 1-2c *; | [A]US2003141990 (COON BRADLEY S [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US6958707 (SIEGEL MICHAEL AARON [US]) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 1 - column 12, line 19; figures 1A-3C *; | [X]US2007159354 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0049]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4238778 | US4241326 | US6958707 | NL1026352C | US2007159354 |