EP2192499 - Techniques for identifying and linking related content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novell, Inc. 1800 S Novell Place Provo, Utah 84606-6169 / US | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Stephen R. 428 South Nebo Drive Spanish Fork, UT 84660 / US | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09175765.8 | 12.11.2009 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | US20080323589 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: US 323589 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2192499 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/93 (EP,US);
G06F16/958 (EP,US);
G06Q10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Techniken zur Identifizierung und Verknüpfung von zueinandergehörigem Inhalt | [2010/22] | English: | Techniques for identifying and linking related content | [2010/22] | French: | Techniques pour identifier et lier un contenu connexe | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 09.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/10] | 19.10.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP12182077.3 / EP2544132 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-14 * The claimed subject-matter, with due regard to the description and drawings in accordance with Article 92 EPC, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject-matter and activities excluded from patentability under Article 52(2) and (3) EPC. The information technology employed as an enabler for carrying out said processes is conventional. Its use for carrying out non-technical processes forms part of common general knowledge and it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing of the present application. No documentary evidence is therefore considered necessary. * | by applicant | EP1560394 | EP1560100 | EP1562100 | US6108619 | US20000615726 | US20000512963 | US20000691629 |