EP2196380 - Tractor with a wider steering angle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BCS S.p.A. Via Marradi, 1 20123 Milano (MI) / IT | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castoldi, Fabrizio Via Alberto da Giussano 12 20145, Milano (MI) / IT | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/24] | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09176216.1 | 17.11.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | IT2008MI02193 | 11.12.2008 Original published format: IT MI20082193 | [2010/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196380 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2196380 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62D9/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
B62D7/06 (EP);
B62D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | Traktor mit einem grösseren Lenkwinkel | [2010/24] | English: | Tractor with a wider steering angle | [2010/24] | French: | Tracteur doté d'un angle de direction plus large | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2011 | BE | 03.08.2011 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HR | 03.08.2011 | HU | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | MK | 03.08.2011 | MT | 03.08.2011 | NL | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | SM | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | NO | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | IE | 17.11.2011 | LU | 17.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MK | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
SM | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
LU | 17.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MK | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
SM | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
LU | 17.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MK | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
SM | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MK | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1108569 (DANA ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0002] , [0018] - [0025] - [0027] , [0029] - [0032]; figures 1-4; claims 1-4,6,8 *; | [A]EP1396358 (AGCO SA [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] - [0021] - [0024] - [0026]; figures 2-6; claim 1 * | by applicant | US5046577 | EP0446043 | US5129477 | US5297648 | EP0597515 | EP0634315 | EP0691257 |