EP2326010 - Generating an oscillator signal having a desired frequency in a continuous frequency range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/32] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Ericsson Modems SA impasse Colombelle 8 B 1218 Le Grand-Saconnex / CH | ||
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Ericsson Modems SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | ||
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA 39 Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 1228 Plan-les-Ouates Geneva / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilsson, Magnus Nils Holgerssons väg 5 224 66, Lund / SE | [2017/32] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
Nilsson, Magnus Nils Holgerssons väg 5 224 66, Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2011/21] | Boesen, Johnny Peder Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 09176449.8 | 19.11.2009 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2326010 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2326010 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/099 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
H03L7/099 (EP,US);
H03L7/1976 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2011/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Erzeugung eines Schwingungssignals mit einer gewünschten Frequenz in einem kontinuierlichen Frequenzbereich | [2011/21] | English: | Generating an oscillator signal having a desired frequency in a continuous frequency range | [2011/21] | French: | Génération d'un signal oscillateur doté d'une fréquence souhaitée dans une plage de fréquences continue | [2011/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2009 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IE | 19.11.2017 | LU | 19.11.2017 | MT | 19.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
MT | 19.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7439812 (LOMBAARD CAREL J [ZA], et al) [X] 1,3-4,6,8-9 * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 28; figures 1-3 * * column 8, line 26 - line 58; figure 9 * * column 10, line 1 - line 42; figures 11-12 * [I] 2,7; | [I]EP1770854 (ALTERA CORP [US]) [I] 1-4,6-9 * column 3, paragraph 26 - column 4, paragraph 31; figures 1-6 * * column 4, paragraph 35 - column 8, paragraph 41; figures 7-9 *; | [XI] - EUGENE O'SULLIVAN ET AL, "Ultra-Fast Locking, Low Jitter, Auto-Ranging Phase-Locked Loop", NORCHIP CONFERENCE, 2006. 24TH, IEEE, PI, (20061101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0772-9, pages 251 - 255, XP031057895 [X] 1,3-4,6,8-9 *Sections: Introduction - Time Base Circuit (TBC)*; page 251 - page 253; figures 3-5 * [I] 2,7 | [A] - SHOICHI HARA ET AL, "A 9.3MHz to 5.7GHz tunable LC-based VCO using a divide-by-N injection-locked frequency divider", SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2009. A-SSCC 2009. IEEE ASIAN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091116), ISBN 978-1-4244-4433-5, pages 81 - 84, XP031582932 [A] 1-10 *Sections: I. Introduction - II. Wideband VCO Architecture*; page 81 - page 82; figures 1-2 * |