EP2189624 - Fiber composite reinforced aircraft gas turbine engine drums with radially inwardly extending blades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schilling, Jan Christopher 7298 Bahama Drive Middletown, OH 45044 / US | 02 /
Kray, Nicholas Joseph 10538 Kenridge Drive Blue Ash, OH 45242 / US | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09176462.1 | 19.11.2009 | [2010/21] | Priority number, date | US20080276522 | 24.11.2008 Original published format: US 276522 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2189624 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2189624 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/03, F01D5/06 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
F01D5/03 (EP,US);
F01D5/06 (EP,US);
F02K3/072 (EP,US);
F05D2300/603 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | F01D5/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Faserverbund-verstärkt Trommeln eines Triebwerks mit radial nach innen erstreckenden Schaufeln | [2010/21] | English: | Fiber composite reinforced aircraft gas turbine engine drums with radially inwardly extending blades | [2010/21] | French: | Tambours de moteurs d'avions à turbine à gaz avec des aubes étendantes radialement vers l'intérieur | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3966523 (JAKOBSEN KARL SEVERIN, et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 3-5 ** figures 1-9 *; | [X]US4232996 (STOFFER LEWIS J) [X] 1-6 * columns 2-3 * * figures 1-9 *; | [XI]GB2069065 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [I] 7-15; | [A]US2004060279 (ROBERT JOSEPH ORLANDO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0043] * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2007231144 (SCHREIBER KARL [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0029] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US3554667 | US3625634 | US3765796 | US4790133 | US4860537 | US5307622 | US5632600 | US6213720 | US6732502 | US20080275813 |