EP2161490 - Supporting device to display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Jae Hoo 206-1703 Dongsuwon-LG-village, Mangpo-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Yoon, Boo Keun 103-901 Hyundai 1st I'Park Apt. 693, Mangpo-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Sang Hak 111-1001, Doosan-weve Apt., Banweol-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jin Sung 1106-1201 E-pyeonhanesang-daerim- 4th Apt., Sindorim-dong Guro-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
In, Woo Sung 105-404, Dongtan-Prugio Apt., Yeadangmaeul, Seokwoo-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/16] |
Former [2010/10] | 01 /
Park, Jae Hoo 206-1703 Dongsuwon-LG-village, Mangpo-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Yoon, Boo Keun 103-901 Hyundai 1st I'Park Apt. 693, Mangpo-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Sang Hak 111-1001, Doosan-weve Apt., Banweol-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Jin Sung 1106-1201 E-pyeonhanesang-daerim- 4th Apt., Sindorim-dong Guro-gu Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
In, Woo Sung 105-404, Dongtan-Prugio Apt., Yeadangmaeul, Seokwoo-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09177292.1 | 27.11.2009 | [2010/10] | Priority number, date | KR20080120213 | 30.11.2008 Original published format: KR 20080120213 | KR20090015774 | 25.02.2009 Original published format: KR 20090015774 | KR20090110657 | 17.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090110657 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161490 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161490 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16M13/02, A47G1/18 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
A47G1/18 (EP,US);
F16M11/125 (EP,US);
F16M13/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | F16M13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Hilfsvorrichtung für Anzeigevorrichtung | [2010/10] | English: | Supporting device to display apparatus | [2010/10] | French: | Dispositif de support pour appareil d'affichage | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2009 | AT | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | HR | 18.04.2012 | IT | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MK | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SM | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | NO | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | ES | 29.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 27.11.2012 | LU | 27.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 27.11.2009 | |
AT | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SM | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
LU | 27.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SM | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
LU | 27.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | |
NO | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2116755 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-2,5,9-13 * figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0098] - [0100] - [0103] - [0119] *; | [XY]US2007183866 (GALLIEN JAMES M [US]) [X] 1-2,5 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0031] , [0036] * [Y] 3,6-8; | [Y]US883201 (JOHNSON HARRY T [US]) [Y] 3,6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5947438 (LEMIRE ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-2,9-10,12,14-15 * figure 4 *; | [A]US1262951 (HOUFF JACOB M [US]) [A] 3,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US315614 (THOMAS HALL) [A] 3,6-8 * the whole document * |