EP2154033 - Safety hinge for front car bonnets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexngate Automotive Iberica, S.A. Ctra. Antiqua de Vic. s/n 08520 Les Franqueses Del Valles / ES | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolas Domingo, Joaquin 50, Cami Baix d'Alella 08390 Montgat / ES | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Sugrañes, S.L.P. Calle Provenza 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Sugrañes Patentes y Marcas Calle Provenza 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 09177798.7 | 20.04.2005 | [2010/07] | Priority number, date | ES20040001148 | 13.05.2004 Original published format: ES 200401148 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154033 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154033 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2154033 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34, E05D3/06 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B60R21/34 (EP,ES);
B62D25/12 (ES);
B60R2021/343 (EP);
E05Y2900/536 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsscharnier für PKW-Motorhauben | [2010/07] | English: | Safety hinge for front car bonnets | [2010/07] | French: | Charnière de sécurité destinée à des capots avant de voitures | [2011/08] |
Former [2010/07] | Charnière de sécurité destinée à des capôts avant de voitures | Examination procedure | 16.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 05.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05735619.8 / EP1747123 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | IE | 20.04.2011 | LU | 20.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GB | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LU | 20.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LU | 20.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LU | 20.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GB | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.02.2011 | |
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1120740 ; | [A]DE19948459 (EDSCHA AG [DE]); | [A]DE10116716 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) | by applicant | EP1178917 | WO03012233 | US6588526 |