EP2156952 - Printing machine with an embossing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Straße 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [2013/21] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Straße 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zinke, Michael, Dipl. Ing. Stiegelstr. 17b 65551 Limburg / DE | 02 /
Preisner, Mario Lise-Meitner-Str. 29 73037 Göppingen / DE | [2011/46] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
Zinke, Michael, Dipl. Ing. Stiegelstr. 17b 65551 Limburg / DE | ||
02 /
Preisner, Mario Lise-Meitner-Str. 29 73037 Göppingen / DE | Representative(s) | Stahl, Dietmar manroland sheetfed GmbH Intellectual Property (SRI) Mühlheimerstrasse 341 63075 Offenbach am Main / DE | [2014/26] |
Former [2013/22] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland sheetfed GmbH Intellectual Property Bogen (IPB) Mühlheimer Straße 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2011/46] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 09177833.2 | 13.04.2005 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | DE20041018306 | 13.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004018306 | DE20041021102 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004021102 | [2010/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2156952 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2156952 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2156952 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2156952 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41F19/06 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B41F19/062 (EP,US);
B41M1/24 (EP,US);
B41M5/03 (EP,US);
B41P2217/11 (EP,US);
B41P2217/14 (EP,US);
B41P2219/50 (EP,US);
B41P2219/51 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1168 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1174 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckmaschine mit Prägeeinrichtung | [2010/08] | English: | Printing machine with an embossing device | [2010/08] | French: | Machine d'impression avec un dispositif de gaufrage | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 18.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05731907.1 / EP1737661 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050731907) is 06.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02
14.08.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG BKS - Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02
14.08.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG BKS - Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
Former [2012/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2012
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02
14.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG BKS - Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
Former [2012/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2012
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 05.06.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.12.2013 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2014 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2016 | 28.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.10.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.05.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 22.06.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/42] | 03.12.2012 | Resumption of proceedings | [2012/42] | 17.08.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/25] | 03.12.2012 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/25] | 03.12.2012 | Resumption of proceedings | [2012/44] | 23.06.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/44] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2005 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | IE | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | GB | 13.04.2012 | LU | 13.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | FR | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | AT | 13.04.2014 | [2015/12] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 13.04.2005 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 13.04.2012 | ||
LU | 13.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 13.04.2012 | ||
LU | 13.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 13.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 13.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5565054 (LAPPE KURT [DE], et al) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US5697297 (RASMUSSEN TORBEN [DK]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1147893 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I] - EMERIAU L, "LA DORURE EST << VERNIE >>. ÖGRACE AU DISPOSITIF SPEEDOR D'ECAMO, LA DORURE A FROID SUR PRESSE OFFSET", CARACTERE, CEP INFORMATION PROFESSIONS. PARIS, FR, (19941004), vol. 45, no. 387/388, ISSN 0247-039X, page 146/147, XP000476375 [I] 1 * the whole document * |