EP2193976 - Steering column system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI KIKO Co., Ltd. 2028, Washizu Kosai-shi Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uesaka, Yota c/o Fuji Kiko Co., Ltd. 2028, Washizu Kosai-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09177903.3 | 03.12.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | JP20080311170 | 05.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008311170 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2193976 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2193976 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/184 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | Lenksäulensystem | [2010/23] | English: | Steering column system | [2010/23] | French: | Système de colonne de direction | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1223096 (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0019] - [0037]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5-7; | [A]US2006028010 (YAMADA JUN [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0050] - [0056]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]JP2008207766 (FUJI KIKO KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |