EP2241308 - Method for coating fine particle with lipid membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Kirin Co., Ltd. 1-6-1, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yasuki c/o Pharmaceutical Research Inst. 1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 02 /
Yamauchi, Masahiro c/o Pharmaceutical Research Inst. 1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 03 /
Kusano, Hiroko c/o Pharmaceutical Research Inst. 1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 04 /
Iwata, Takeshi c/o Pharmaceutical Research Inst. 1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 05 /
Uochi, Takaaki c/o Pharmaceutical Research Inst. 1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho, Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 06 /
Akinaga, Shiro c/o Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. Head Office 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008185 / JP | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09178071.8 | 04.10.2001 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | JP20000305065 | 04.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000305065 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2241308 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2241308 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K47/24, A61K47/44, A61K31/711, A61K31/70, A61K31/74, A61K48/00, A61K38/02, B01J13/12 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
B01J13/22 (KR);
A61K9/5123 (US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K47/6911 (EP,US);
A61K9/1271 (US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61K9/141 (US);
A61K9/146 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Methode zur Beschichtung feiner Teilchen mit einem Lipidfil | [2010/42] | English: | Method for coating fine particle with lipid membrane | [2010/42] | French: | Procédé de revêtement de particules fines avec un film de lipides | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01974690.8 / EP1323415 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010974690) is 14.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0275358 (OGAWARA KAKOKI KK [JP]) [X] 1,8,9,15,16 * examples 1,2 * [I] 2-7,10-14,17-19; | [A]WO9004384 (ROYAL FREE HOSP SCHOOL MED [GB]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP0418153 (MEDGENIX GROUP SA [BE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |