EP2330027 - Remotely operated submersible vehicle with adjustable tether mounting terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOIL MACHINE DYNAMICS LIMITED Turbinia Works Davy Bank Wallsend Tyne & Wear NE28 6UZ / GB | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunt, Andrew 32 Seacrest Avenue North Shields Tyne & Wear NE30 3DP / GB | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor, Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street 156 Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09178230.0 | 07.12.2009 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330027 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/66, B63G8/42 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
B63C11/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | Ferngesteuertes Tauchfahrzeug mit einstellbarer Leinenbefestigungsklemme | [2011/23] | English: | Remotely operated submersible vehicle with adjustable tether mounting terminal | [2011/23] | French: | Véhicule submersible commandé à distance avec terminal de montage d'amarre réglable | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4350111 (BOYCE II WILLIAM D) [X] 1-4,13 * column 2, lines 58-64 * * column 7, line 5 - column 9, line 2 * * column 11, lines 29-53; figure - *; | [A]US3613626 (KELLY RAYMOND E, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 4, lines 8-16; figure - *; | [X]US4030434 (PEDLAR ROY, et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-13 * column 2, lines 52-60; figure - *; | [X]US3024757 (ASCHINGER HAROLD W) [X] 1,3,5-6 * column 2, lines 7-43; figure - *; | [X]US3137264 (BRAINARD II EDWARD C, et al) [X] 1-3,5-6 * page 2, lines 43-46 * * column 3, lines 23-63 * * column 5, lines 42-59; figure - * |