EP2223728 - Sealing material for honeycomb structured body, honeycomb structured body, and method for manufacturing honeycomb structured body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanai, Masanori c/o IBIDEN CO., LTD. Ogaki Kita Plant 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawacho, Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09178826.5 | 11.12.2009 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | WO2009JP52233 | 10.02.2009 Original published format: PCT/JP2009/052233 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223728 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2223728 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
B01D46/2418 (EP,US);
B01D46/2455 (US);
B01D46/2476 (EP,US);
B01D46/2478 (EP,US);
B01D46/2486 (US);
B01D46/249 (US);
C04B28/24 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B38/0019 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5089 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
B01D2279/30 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/442 (EP,US);
C04B2235/443 (EP,US);
C04B2235/447 (EP,US);
C04B2235/448 (EP,US);
C04B2235/449 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5228 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/526 (EP,US);
C04B2235/549 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2237/08 (EP,US);
C04B2237/083 (EP,US);
C04B2237/09 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/24, C04B14/28, C04B14/324, C04B14/4656, C04B20/0048 (EP,US);
C04B38/0019, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/00, C04B38/0006 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/565, C04B38/0006 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | Dichtungsmaterial für Wabenstrukturkörper, Wabenstrukturkörper und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wabenstrukturkörpers | [2010/35] | English: | Sealing material for honeycomb structured body, honeycomb structured body, and method for manufacturing honeycomb structured body | [2010/35] | French: | Matériau d'étanchéité pour corps structuré en nid d'abeille, corps structuré en nid d'abeille et son procédé de fabrication | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 29.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HR | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | MK | 30.03.2011 | MT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | SM | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | NO | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | IE | 11.12.2011 | LU | 11.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MK | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
SM | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 11.12.2011 | ||
LU | 11.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MK | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
SM | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 11.12.2011 | ||
LU | 11.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MK | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
SM | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 11.12.2011 | ||
LU | 11.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MK | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
SM | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 11.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MK | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 11.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 11.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
IE | 11.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 30.03.2011 | |
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5290522 (ROGERS JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-16* examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2007143437 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 9, line 16 - page 12, line 25 *; | [A]EP1997789 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046]; claims 1,4 * |