EP2158859 - Trocar anchor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenchell, Thomas 73 Oak Terrace Durham, CT 06422 / US | 02 /
Gresham, Richard D. 134 East Gate Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09179213.5 | 11.10.2006 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | US20050249830 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: US 249830 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2158859 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158859 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/34 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3419 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3484 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2010/09] | Title | German: | Trokar mit Befestigungsmitteln | [2010/09] | English: | Trocar anchor | [2010/09] | French: | Trocart comprenant un système d'ancrage | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06021336.0 / EP1774918 | Divisional application(s) | EP10182759.0 / EP2266476 | EP10182765.7 / EP2263576 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060021336) is 25.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.04.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/48] | ES | 28.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2810555 (SOPRANE SA [FR]) [X] 1-6,10 * page 4, line 24 - page 11, line 12 * * figures 1-16 *; | [A]WO2004028613 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 8 - page 12, line 26 * * figures 1-16 *; | [A]WO9850104 (INNERDYNE MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 30 - page 14, line 12 * * figure - * | Examination | US3713447 | GB2150837 | US3721229 | US5429598 | by applicant | FR2810555 |