EP2206893 - Combined Surface Cooler and Acoustic Absorber for Turbomachines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states General Electric Company a New York Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wood, Trevor Howard 77 Longwood Drive Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 02 /
Wetzel, Todd Garrett 9 Riverdale Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Luedke, Jonathan Glenn 103 Whiffletree Drive Simpsonville, SC 29680 / US | 04 /
Tucker, Thomas Michael 1178 West Seymour Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45216 / US | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Szary, Anne Catherine GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09179366.1 | 16.12.2009 | [2010/28] | Priority number, date | US20080342466 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: US 342466 | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2206893 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2206893 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/12, F02C7/045, F02C7/12, F02K1/82 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
F02K1/827 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F02C7/045 (EP,US);
F02C7/12 (EP,US);
F05D2300/224 (EP,US);
F05D2300/612 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kombinierte Oberflächenkühlvorrichtung und Schallabsorptionsvorrichtung für Turbomaschinen | [2010/28] | English: | Combined Surface Cooler and Acoustic Absorber for Turbomachines | [2010/28] | French: | Combinaison de refroidisseur de surface et absorbeur acoustique pour turbomachines | [2010/28] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 12.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10034301 (BRUSS DICHTUNGSTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,11,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0019] - [0026]; figure - * [I] 7-10,12,13; | [X]WO03106263 (SAAB AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15 * page 6 - page 8; figure - *; | [X]US2005111966 (METHENY ALFRED P [US]) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP1591643 (AIRBUS FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,3,14,15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] *; | [X]US4759000 (REITZ RONALD P [US]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 57; figure - * | [X] - KIRCA ET AL, "Computational modeling of micro-cellular carbon foams", FINITE ELEMENTS IN ANALYSIS AND DESIGN, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071017), vol. 44, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.FINEL.2007.08.008, ISSN 0168-874X, pages 45 - 52, XP022350527 [X] 1,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.finel.2007.08.008 |