EP2336464 - Locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cedardell Limited St Ann's Wharf 112 Quayside Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE1 3DX / GB | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Todd, Robert Edmund 3 Gilsland Grove Cramlingon, Northumberland NE23 3SY / GB | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Byworth, Ian James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Byworth, Ian James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09179405.7 | 16.12.2009 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2336464 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/00, E05B63/00, E05C9/18 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
E05B65/0075 (EP);
E05B63/0065 (EP);
E05B17/2084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verriegelungsmechanismus | [2011/25] | English: | Locking mechanism | [2011/25] | French: | Mécanisme de verrouillage | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/27] | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1359271 (IPM INTERNAT SA [CH]) [X] 1,10,13,14 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0020]; figures 8,9 * [A] 2 [I] 15; | [XAI]GB2297121 (GLOWACKI MAREK [PL], et al) [X] 1,10-12,15 * the whole document * [A] 2 [I] 13,14; | [XA]GB2055137 (FICHET BAUCHE) [X] 1,10-15 * figure - * [A] 2; | [X]FR2641816 (PICARD [FR]) [X] 1,10,11,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4926664 (GARTNER KLAUS W [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11,15 * figures 2,3,4 *; | [AD]WO2008145961 (CEDARDELL LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document * |