EP2199630 - Holding structure for a fastening element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROSTYLE SYSTEMS 28 allée des Sablons 36000 Châteauroux / FR | [2010/36] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states EUROSTYLE FRANCE Les Conquérants - Bâtiment Kilimandjaro 1 avenue de l'Atlantique 91940 Les Ulis / FR | ||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Eurostyle France 4, Rue des Petits Ruisseaux ZA des Godets 91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durand, Jean-Michel 29 rue Montplaisir 36120, Etrechet / FR | 02 /
Guyot, Robert 12 allée Benjamin Rabier 36330, Le Poiconnet / FR | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Durand, Jean-Michel 29 rue Montplaisir 36120, Etrechet / FR | ||
02 /
Guyot, Robert 12 allée Benjamin Rabier 36330, Le Poiconnet / FR | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Madeuf 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/25] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Madeuf, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09179752.2 | 17.12.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | FR20080058717 | 17.12.2008 Original published format: FR 0858717 | [2010/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199630 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199630 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/06, F16B21/09 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
F16B21/09 (EP);
F16B21/06 (EP);
F16B5/0657 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | F16B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Haltestruktur für ein Befestigungselement | [2010/25] | English: | Holding structure for a fastening element | [2010/25] | French: | Structure de retenue d'un élément d'attache | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2009 | AT | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | HR | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | MT | 16.12.2015 | NL | 16.12.2015 | PL | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | IE | 17.12.2015 | LU | 17.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | GB | 16.03.2016 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 17.12.2009 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.12.2009 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0274683 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 28 - line 54; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3288192 (BOLLINGER CARL G) [A] 1-2,6 * column 2, line 9 - line 19; figures 1,4-6 * |