EP2267832 - Integrated system comprising waveguide to microstrip coupling apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven Minderbroederstraat 8A 3000 Leuven / BE | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enayati, Amin Egenhovenweg 51 bus 73 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
Brebels, Steven IMEC Schansdijkstraat 10 3940 Hechtel-Eksel / BE | 03 /
De Raedt, Walter IMEC Kriekhof 37 2547 Lint / BE | 04 /
Vandenbosch, Guy K.U. Leuven R&D Katholieke Universiteit Leuven Grote Bergen 52 2830 Heindonk (Willebroek) / BE | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Hertoghe, Kris Angèle Louisa, et al DenK iP bvba Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Hertoghe, Kris Angèle Louisa, et al DenK iP bvba Hundelgemsesteenweg 1114 9820 Merelbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 09179861.1 | 18.12.2009 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US20090186267P | 11.06.2009 Original published format: US 186267 P | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267832 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/107 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H01P5/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Integriertes System mit einem Wellenleiter für eine Mikrostreifen-Kopplungsvorrichtung | [2010/52] | English: | Integrated system comprising waveguide to microstrip coupling apparatus | [2010/52] | French: | Système intégré comprenant un guide d'ondes sur un appareil de couplage de microruban | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1983614 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * paragraphs [0017] , [0053] - [0058] - [0060]; figures 5-1(a)-5-2(d) * [Y] 7,10; | [IY]US5770981 (KOIZUMI TAKAO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, lines 1-40 * * column 4, lines 5-10 * [Y] 7,10; | [X]EP1367668 (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS [IT]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] *; | [X]EP1304762 (FUJITSU COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [1924] , [0025] *; | [X]JP2009038696 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract *; | [X]JP2008252207 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP1720213 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]US2008316143 (CHEN MING [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * paragraph [0046] * * abstract * |