EP2186806 - Flavanone compound and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POKKA CORPORATION 4-2-29, Sakae Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-8415 / JP | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAZAWA, Shigenori 4-1-15-301, Kamiashiarai Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 420-0841 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Tsutomu 220-2, Shimizu-Kusanagi Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-0886 / JP | 03 /
SHIMOI, Kayoko 2-91-11, Tamachi Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 420-0068 / JP | 04 /
GOTO, Takaki 4-1-68, Hachiman Ichinomiya-shi Aichi 491-0903 / JP | 05 /
FUKUMOTO, Syuichi 5-5-16 Takakuradai Kasugai Aichi 481-0017 / JP | 06 /
ARAKAKI, Tsutomu 1-29, Syurikinjo-cho Naha-shi Okinawa 903-0815 / JP | [2010/30] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
KUMAZAWA, Shigenori 4-1-15-301, Kamiashiarai Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 420-0841 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAYAMA, Tsutomu 220-2, Shimizu-Kusanagi Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-0886 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMOI, Kayoko 2-91-11, Tamachi Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 420-0068 / JP | |||
04 /
GOTO, Takaki 4-1-68, Hachiman Ichinomiya-shi Aichi 491-0903 / JP | |||
05 /
FUKUMOTO, Syuichi 28-1, Manowari, Kaniehonmachi, Kanie-cho Ama-gun Aichi 497-0033 / JP | |||
06 /
ARAKAKI, Tsutomu 1-29, Syurikinjo-cho Naha-shi Okinawa 903-0815 / JP | Representative(s) | Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09179875.1 | 18.06.2004 | [2010/20] | Priority number, date | JP20030177333 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003177333 | JP20030177332 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003177332 | JP20040123480 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004123480 | JP20040123479 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004123479 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186806 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/32, A61K31/352, A61P31/04, A61P35/00, A61P39/06, A23L1/29, C09K15/08, A61K8/18 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C07D311/34 (EP,US);
C09K15/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/522 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | Flavanonverbindung und ihre Verwendung | [2010/20] | English: | Flavanone compound and uses thereof | [2010/20] | French: | Composé de flavanone et ses utilisations | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 05.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04746433.4 / EP1640371 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040746433) is 06.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001031735 (PERRIER ERIC [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2003061593 (API CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y] - CHIA-NAN CHEN ET AL, "Cytotoxic Prenylflavanones from Taiwanese Propolis", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030329), vol. 66, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 503 - 506, XP002390725 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np0203180 | [Y] - V.S. BANKOVA, S.S. POPOV, N.L. MAREKOV, "A study on Flavonoids of Propolis", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (1983), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 471 - 474, XP002524984 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50028a007 | [Y] - M. SIESS ET AL., "Flavonoids of honey and propolis: Characterization and effects on hepatic drug-metabolizing enzymes and benzo[a]pyrene-DNA binding in rats", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1996), vol. 44, no. 8, pages 2297 - 2301, XP002524985 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9504733 | [Y] - LEE D ET AL, "AROMATASE INHIBITORS FROM BROUSSONETIA PAPYRIFERA", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20010101), vol. 64, no. 10, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 1286 - 1293, XP001134953 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np010288l | [Y] - PRYTZYK E ET AL, "Flavonoids and trypanocidal activity of Bulgarian propolis", MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (19010101), XP018000321 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - MERESTA ET AL, "ANTIBACTERIAL ACTIVITY OF FLAVONOID COMPOUNDS", Chemical Abstracts, Chemi, (19880101), Database accession no. 109:35198s, URL: CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002130343 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [ ] - MERESTA, LUDWIK; MERESTA, TADEUSZ, BULL. VET. INST. PULAWY, (1986), vol. 28-29, no. 1-4, pages 61 - 63 | [A] - MC MARCUCCI, "Propolis:chemical composition, biological properties and therapeutic activity", APIDOLOGIE, (1995), vol. 26, pages 83 - 99, XP002524986 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1051/apido:19950202 | by applicant | - K. YAKUSHIJIN; K. SHIBAYAMA; H. MURATA; H. FURUKAWA, "New prenylflavanones from Hernandia nymphaefolia(presl) Kubitzki", HETEROCYCLES, (1980), vol. 14, pages 397 - 402 | - W. R. PHILLIPS; N. J. BAJ; A. A. L. GUNATILAKA; D. G. I. KINGSTON, "C-Geranyl compounds from Mimulus clevelandii", J. NAT. PROD., (1996), vol. 59, pages 495 - 497 | - M. H. TSENG; C. H. CHOU; Y. M. CHEN; Y. H. KUO, "Allelopathic prenylflavanones from the fallen leaves of Macaranga tanarius", J. NAT. PROD., (2001), vol. 64, pages 827 - 828 |