EP2199465 - Interlocking modular flooring assembly with bevelled connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANI-MAT INC. 284, Chemin Godin Sherbrooke, QC J1R 0S6 / CA | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allard, Ange Albert 920, 106e Avenue Drummondville Québec J2B 4P1 / CA | 02 /
Savary, Pierre 2797 Honoré de Balzac Sherbrooke Québec J1L 0B2 / CA | 03 /
Tremblay, Frederic 116 Castonguay Sherbrooke Québec J0B 1H0 / CA | 04 /
Lamontagne, David 403 Sara Sherbrooke Québec J1H 5V8 / CA | [2013/18] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Allard, Ange Albert 920, 106e Avenue Drummondville Québec J2B 4P1 / CA | ||
02 /
Savary, Pierre 2797 Honoré de Balzac Sherbrooke Québec J1L 0B2 / CA | |||
03 /
Tremblay, Frederic 116 Castonguay Sherbrooke Québec J0B 1H0 / CA | |||
04 /
Lamontagne, David 403 Sara Sherbrooke Québec J1H 5V8 / CA | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Hafenspitze Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09180319.7 | 22.12.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | US20080139815P | 22.12.2008 Original published format: US 139815 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2199465 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2199465 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199465 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E01C5/20, E04F15/10 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
E01C5/20 (EP,US);
A01K1/0157 (EP,US);
E04F15/02172 (EP,US);
E04F15/10 (EP,US);
E04F2201/091 (EP,US);
E04F2201/095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | Eingriffmodul-Fußbodenanordnung mit abgeschrägten Verbindungsstücken | [2010/25] | English: | Interlocking modular flooring assembly with bevelled connectors | [2010/25] | French: | Ensemble de plancher modulaire interbloquant doté de connecteurs biseautés | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 22.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2009 | AT | 01.05.2013 | BE | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MK | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | SM | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | NO | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | GB | 22.12.2013 | IE | 22.12.2013 | LU | 22.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
AT | 01.05.2013 | ||
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MK | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 22.12.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MK | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 22.12.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 22.12.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 22.12.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0117638 (HODSON CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US888530 (PUGH JOHN H [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE2435735 (BURR KARL) [A] 1 * figures 5-26 * | by applicant | US654532 | US5791114 | US3909996 |