EP2174954 - Hematopoietic cell e-selectin/l-selectin ligand polypeptides and methods of use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/15] | Hematopoietic cell e-selection/l-selectin ligand polypeptides and methods of use thereof | ||
[2015/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sackstein, Robert 26 Fox Run Road Sudbury MA 01776 / US | [2012/37] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states The Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc. 75 Francis Street Boston MA 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/37] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Sackstein, Robert 26 Fox Run Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrea, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [2016/12] |
Former [2010/15] | Fleck, Barbara Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09180380.9 | 18.10.2001 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20000240987P | 18.10.2000 Original published format: US 240987 P | US20010297474P | 10.06.2001 Original published format: US 297474 P | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174954 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174954 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C07K16/28, G01N33/68, C12N5/0789, A61K35/12 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
C12N5/0647 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/70585 (EP,US);
A61K2035/124 (EP,US);
C12N2501/59 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | C07K14/705, C07K16/28, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | E-Selectin/L-Selectin-Ligandenpolypeptide aus hämatopoetische Zellen und Verwendungsverfahren dafür | [2015/13] | English: | Hematopoietic cell e-selectin/l-selectin ligand polypeptides and methods of use thereof | [2015/13] | French: | Polypeptides ligands E-sélectine/L-sélectine de cellules hématopoïétiques et leurs procédés d'utilisation | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/15] | Hämatopoetische E-Zellen-Auswahl/L-Selectin-Ligandenpolypeptide und Verwendungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2010/15] | Hematopoietic cell e-selection/l-selectin ligand polypeptides and methods of use thereof | ||
Former [2010/15] | Polypeptides ligands E/sélection/L sélectine de cellules hématopoïétiques et leurs procédés d'utilisation | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 14.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01988458.4 / EP1421174 | Divisional application(s) | EP16161354.2 / EP3106467 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010988458) is 04.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | LU | 18.10.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - OXLEY SUSAN M ET AL, "Detection of an L-selectin ligand on a hematopoietic progenitor cell line", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, no. 10, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3299 - 3306, XP002288887 [X] 1-4,6,8-10,13-15 * page 3303, column R, paragraph 2 - page 3304, column R, paragraph 1; table 2 * * page 3305, column L, paragraph 3 * | [X] - SACKSTEIN ROBERT ET AL, "A hematopoietic cell L-selectin ligand that is distinct from PSGL-1 and displays N-glycan-dependent binding activity", BLOOD, (20001015), vol. 96, no. 8, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2765 - 2774, XP002288888 [X] 1-4,6,8-10,13-15 * page 2769, column R, paragraph 1 - page 2770, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 2773, column R, line 2 - line 4 * | [XI] - GREENBERG ADAM W ET AL, "Relationship between selectin-mediated rolling of hematopoietic stem and progenitor cells and progression in hematopoietic development", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20000115), vol. 95, no. 2, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 478 - 486, XP002450253 [X] 5 * page 479, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 480, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 480, column 1, paragraph 5 - page 485, column 2, paragraph 1 * [I] 7,11-12 | [XI] - BORGES E ET AL, "The binding of T cell-expressed P-selectin glycoprotein ligand-1 to E- and P-selectin is differentially regulated.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 7 NOV 1997, (19971107), vol. 272, no. 45, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 28786 - 28792, XP002569716 [X] 1,3 * abstract * [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.45.28786 | [A] - GHAFFARI S ET AL, "CD44 isoforms in normal and leukemic hematopoiesis.", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY JUN 1999, (199906), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 0301-472X, pages 978 - 993, XP002569717 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-472X(99)00023-5 | [XP] - DIMITROFF CHARLES J ET AL, "A distinct glycoform of CD44 is an L-selectin ligand on human hematopoietic cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20001205), vol. 97, no. 25, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13841 - 13846, XP002288889 [XP] 1-4,6,8-10,13-15 * page 13841, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 13844, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.250484797 | [XP] - DIMITROFF CHARLES J ET AL, "CD44 is a major E-selectin ligand on human hematopoietic progenitor cells", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (20010611), vol. 153, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 1277 - 1286, XP002288890 [XP] 1-4,6,8-10,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.153.6.1277 | [T] - SACKSTEIN ROBERT, "The bone marrow is akin to skin: HCELL and the biology of hematopoietic stem cell homing", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (200405), vol. 122, no. 5, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 1061 - 1069, XP002288891 [T] 1-4,6,8-10,13-15 * page 1064, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.0022-202X.2004.09301.x | Examination | - ZANNETTINO A C ET AL, Primitive human hematopoietic progenitors adhere to P-selectin (CD62P)., BLOOD 15 JUN 1995 LNKD- PUBMED:7540063, VOL. 85, NR. 12, PAGE(S) 3466 - 3477, (19950615), ISSN 0006-4971 |