EP2172227 - Methods for reducing adventitious agents or toxins in a sample and cell culture reagents produced thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biddle, William C. 54 Whitehall Avenue Buffalo, NY 14220 / US | 02 /
Fike, Richard M. 9310 Hunting Valley Road Clarence, NY 14031 / US | 03 /
Dadey, Barbara M. 143 Brooklea Drive East Aurora, NY 14052 / US | 04 /
Bulera, Thomas E. 42 Wilkshire Place Lancaster, NY 14086-2704 / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09180485.6 | 30.06.1999 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | US19980091275P | 30.06.1998 Original published format: US 91275 P | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2172227 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2172227 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | [2010/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2172227 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, A61L2/06, C12N1/00, C12N5/00, F26B3/12 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
F26B3/12 (EP);
A61L2/0094 (EP);
A61L2/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | A61L2/20, A61L2/06, F26B3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduzierung von schädlichen Stoffen oder Toxinen in einer Probe und dadurch produzierte Zellkulturreagenzien | [2010/14] | English: | Methods for reducing adventitious agents or toxins in a sample and cell culture reagents produced thereby | [2010/14] | French: | Procédés servant à reduire des agents adventicés ou des toxines dans un échantillon et réactifs de cultures cellulaires obtenus par ce procédé | [2010/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 17.12.2010 | New documents discovered [2011/16] | 07.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99933615.9 / EP1091765 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990933615) is 17.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9738734 (ACANOVA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,13-15 * page 1, line 2 - line 8 * * page 3, line 2 - line 16 * * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 10; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9742980 (QUADRANT HOLDINGS CAMBRIDGE [GB], et al) [X] 1-16,18,19 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 9, line 13 - page 14, line 24; examples 1-4; claims 1, 21, 34, 40-43 *; | [X]US4632980 (ZEE YUAN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,13-16 * column 1, line 43 - column 4, line 17; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US5700426 (SCHMITTHAEUSLER ROLAND [FR], et al) [X] 1-16,18,19 * column 2, line 8 - column 5, line 57; examples I-XI; claims 1,3 *; | [X]JPH04198137 (SUMITOMO PHARMA) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]WO9815297 (LIFETECH CORP [CA]) [X] 1-6,8,9,13-17 * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 2 * * page 9, line 14 - page 25, line 12; examples 1-8 *; | [X]WO9222637 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8,9,13-16 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 8, line 3 - page 30; examples I-VII; claims 1-26, 35-39 *; | [XP]WO9836051 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XP] 1-19 * page 1, line 4 - line 21 * * page 6, line 6 - page 9, line 11 * * page 12, line 15 - page 38, line 24; examples 1-16; claims 1-47,73-91 * | [X] - DOWNES T.E.H. ET AL., "The relative nutritive value of irradiated spray-dried blood powder and heat-sterilized blood meal as measured in combination with whey protein", SOUTH AFRICAN JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 55 - 58, XP001008128 [X] 1-16,18,19 * page 55 - page 58 * | by applicant | US4673649 | US5474931 | US3771237 | US4885848 | US5133137 | US5357688 | US5392531 | WO9513867 | US5006204 | US4511592 | US4689297 | DK167090B | US5325606 | - RINGER, S, J PHYSIOL., vol. 3, pages 380 - 393 | - WAYRNOUTH, C., Cells and Tissues in Culture, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1965), vol. 1, pages 99 - 142 | - WAYMOUTH, C., IN VITRO, (1970), vol. 6, pages 109 - 127 | - COHEN, S., J. BIOL. CHERN, (1961), vol. 237, pages 1555 - 1565 | - PEEHL, D.M.; HAM, R.G., IN VITRO, (1980), vol. 16, pages 516 - 525 | - MACIAG, T. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 5674 - 5678 | - GILCHREST, B.A. ET AL., J. CELL. PHYSIOL, (1984), vol. 120, pages 377 - 383 | - BARRETAULT, D. ET AL., DIFFERENTIATION, (1981), vol. 18, pages 29 - 42 | - MACIAG, T. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1981), vol. 211, pages 1452 - 1454 | - LAMBERT, K.J. ET AL., Animal Cell Biotechnology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), vol. 1, pages 85 - 122 | - E. KURSTAK AND C. KURSTAK,, Comparative Diagnosis of Viral Diseases, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. I-IV | - A. SAMIY, L. SMITH, K, J. WYNGAARDEN, Medical Microbiology and Infectious Diseases, W.B. SAUNDERS CO., vol. II | - A. SAMIY, L. SMITH, JR., J. WYNGAARDEN, Medical Microbiology and infectious Diseases, W.B. SAUNDERS CO., vol. II | - A. SAMIY, L. SMITH, JR., J. WYNGAARDEN, Medical Microbiology and Infectious Diseases, W.B. SAUNDERS CO., vol. 11 | - FRESHNEY, R.I., Culture ojAnimal Cells, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1983), pages 74 - 78 | - HARLOW, E.; LANE, D., Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1988), pages 116 - 120 | - pyrogens, Endotoxins, LAL Testing, Depyrogenation, MARCEL DEKKER, INC. |