EP2202707 - Monitoring road usage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
LI
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Vodafone Group PLC Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FB / GB | For:ES
Vodafone España, S.A.U. Avda. de Europa no. 1 28108 Alcobendas / ES | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Alberto Vodafone Espana S.A.U. Area de Tecnologia c/Isabel Colbrand Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte 28050 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Almodóvar Herraiz, Daniel Vodafone Espana S.A.U. Area de Tecnologia c/Isabel Colbrand Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte 28050 Madrid / ES | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Keston, David Arthur Vodafone Group Services Ltd. Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Keston, David Arthur Vodafone Group Services Ltd. Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Application number, filing date | 09180509.3 | 22.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | ES20080003680 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: ES 200803680 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202707 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/017, G07B15/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
G08G1/017 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Strassennutzungsüberwachung | [2010/26] | English: | Monitoring road usage | [2010/26] | French: | Surveillance d'utilisation de route | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1868164 (VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0006] , [0008] , [0010] , [0015] - [0017] - [0019] - [0021] - [0023] , [0024] , [0026] , [0027] , [0031] * * claims 1,6,8,10 * [Y] 3,5; | [AD]EP1879151 (VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0012] - [0014] , [0017] , [0024] , [0035] , [0046] , [0059] , [0071] * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008010756 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 2 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 15 * * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 17 * * page 13, lines 8-19 * * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 2 * * claims 1,5,12,18 ** figures 1-4 *; | [IY]WO2008040391 (EUREKA S A [LU], et al) [I] 1,2,4,6-9 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4-10 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 21 * * page 6, lines 1-4 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 8 * * page 9, lines 10-20 * * page 12, lines 5-9 * * page 14, lines 13-14 * * page 16, lines 16-18 * * page 18, lines 6-10 * * page 18, line 26 - page 19, line 3 * * page 19, line 23 - page 20, line 2 * * page 22, lines 8-14 * * claims 1,2,5,7-12,18-22 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5 | by applicant | EP0750828 | EP1879151 | EP1879150 |