EP2202594 - Massage Bathtub Automatic Control System and Method for Controlling the Same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dartpoint Tech. Co., Ltd 2F, No. 363, Fu-shing S. Road, Sec. 2 Taipei 231 / TW | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsieh, Chung Hsin 2F, NO. 363, FU-SHING S. RD., SEC. 2 231, TAIPEI / TW | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Martin Patentanwalt Martin Schweiger Erhardtstraße 12 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Schweiger, Martin Schweiger & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Karlstrasse 35 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09180510.1 | 23.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | TW20080150410 | 24.12.2008 Original published format: TW 97150410 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202594 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automatisches Steuersystem für Massagebadewannen und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2010/26] | English: | Massage Bathtub Automatic Control System and Method for Controlling the Same | [2010/26] | French: | Système de contrôle automatique de baignoire à massage et son procédé de contrôle | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 23.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | TW574034B |