EP2343081 - Interferon analogs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rijksuniversiteit Groningen Broerstraat 5 9712 CP Groningen / NL | For all designated states Stichting voor de Technische Wetenschappen Van Vollenhovenlaan 661 3527 JP Utrecht / NL | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09181049.9 | 31.12.2009 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343081 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/12, A61K38/21, C07K5/00, C07K14/57, A61P37/00, A61P35/00, A61P31/12, A61P43/00, A61P1/16, A61P9/10, A61P11/00 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
A61K38/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/217 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/57 (KR,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K38/19 (KR);
A61K38/20 (KR);
A61K38/21 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/475 (KR);
C07K14/555 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/22 (KR);
C07K5/0808 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/081 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/0815 (US);
C07K5/0817 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/0819 (EP,KR,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/09 (US);
C07K2319/74 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Interferon-Analoga | [2011/28] | English: | Interferon analogs | [2011/28] | French: | Analogues d'interféron | [2011/28] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2011/52] | 09.08.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5770191 (JOHNSON HOWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 45 * * column 5, line 55 - line 59 *; | [I]WO0023113 (STICHTING TECH WETENSCHAPP [NL], et al) [I] 10-16 * page 5, line 6 - line 19 * * page 7, line 10 - line 16 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 6 * * claims 16, 19, 28 * * examples 1-4 *; | [A]WO2004005341 (MAXYGEN HOLDINGS LTD [KY], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 3 line 20 - page 4 line 15 *; | [A]WO2008068621 (MOLMED SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1, 12, 13 *; | [I] - WERNER I HAGENS ET AL, "Targeting 15d-Prostaglandin J2 to Hepatic Stellate Cells: Two Options Evaluated", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S11095-006-9175-2, (20070124), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 1573-904X, pages 566 - 574, XP019483489 [I] 10-16 * abstract page 567, right column, paragraph 2 Fig. 1-5 page 573, left column, paragraphs 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-006-9175-2 | [A] - AHMED CHULBUL M I ET AL, "Peptide mimotics of gamma interferon possess antiviral properties against vaccinia virus and other viruses in the presence of poxvirus B8R protein", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200505), vol. 79, no. 9, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5632 - 5639, XP002586641 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1-5, 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.79.9.5632-5639.2005 | [A] - AHMED CHULBUL M ET AL, "IFN mimetic as a therapeutic for lethal vaccinia virus infection: Possible effects on innate and adaptive immune responses", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200704), vol. 178, no. 7, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4576 - 4583, XP002586642 [A] 1-16 * abstract Fig. 1-7 * | [A] - BELJAARS LEONIE ET AL, "The preferential homing of a platelet derived growth factor receptor-recognizing macromolecule to fibroblast-like cells in fibrotic tissue.", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (20031001), vol. 66, no. 7, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 1307 - 1317, XP002586643 [A] 1-16 * page 1308, column left, paragraph 3 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-2952(03)00445-3 | [A] - SUBRAMANIAM PREM S ET AL, "The COOH-terminal nuclear localization sequence of interferon gamma regulates STAT1alpha nuclear translocation at an intracellular site", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (200008), vol. 113, no. 15, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 2771 - 2781, XP002586644 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - TEMMING ET AL, "RGD-based strategies for selective delivery of therapeutics and imaging agents to the tumour vasculature", DRUG RESISTANCE UPDATES, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, EDINBURGH, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.DRUP.2005.10.002, (20051201), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 1368-7646, pages 381 - 402, XP005328751 [A] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drup.2005.10.002 | by applicant | EP0844252 | EP1117443 | WO2008068621 | - PLATANIAS, L. C., "Nature reviews", IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 375 - 386 | - KIDNEY INT., (1999), vol. 56, pages 2116 - 27 | - HEPATOLOGY, (1996), vol. 23, pages 1189 - 99 | - PHARM RES., (2000), vol. 17, pages 42 - 8 | - PHARM RES., (1996), vol. 13, pages 1464 - 75 | - J CONTROL RELEASE, (2005), vol. 102, pages 607 - 17 | - SUBRAMANIAM ET AL., J. CELL SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 113, pages 2771 - 2781 | - MUJTABA ET AL., CLINICAL AND VACCINE IMMUNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 944 - 952 | - SUBRAMANIAM ET AL., J. INTERFERON CYTOKINE RES., (2001), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 951 - 959 | - CHEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, vol. 97, no. 1, pages 123 - 143 | - HEMMANN S; GRAF J; RODERFELD M; ROEB. J, HEPATOL., (200705), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 955 - 75 |