EP2086058 - Cable assembly with adjustable cable outlet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Tzu Yu Street Tu-Cheng City Taipei Hsien / TW | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xu, Bin c/o Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Tzu Yu Street Tu-Cheng City, Taipei Hsien Taiwan / TW | 02 /
Liu, Su-Feng c/o Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Tzu Yu Street Tu-Cheng City, Taipei Hsien Taiwan / TW | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Craven, Ian Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Craven, Ian Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250026.3 | 07.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | CN2008231479U | 01.02.2008 Original published format: CN 200820031479 U | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086058 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2086058 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/03, H01R13/512, H01R13/66 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H01R13/512 (EP);
H01R13/6658 (EP);
H01R9/031 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/48] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabelanordnung mit einstellbarem Kabelauslass | [2009/32] | English: | Cable assembly with adjustable cable outlet | [2009/32] | French: | Ensemble de câble doté d'une sortie de câble réglable | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 04.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004214469 (WU JERRY [US]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-12 * [I] 2-8,10-16; | [XI]US7114980 (WU JERRY [US]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1,2,10-12, 18, 22,23 * [I] 2-8,10-16; | [XI]US2007037437 (WU JERRY [US]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-3,5,6 * [I] 2-8,10-16; | [XI]US2007049082 (WU JERRY [US]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-4, 10-12 * [I] 2-8,10-16; | [XI]US6179627 (DALY JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 8 - column 18; figures 1-5,8-12 * [I] 2-8,10-16; | [XI]US6203333 (MEDINA RAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-5 * [I] 2-8,10-16; | [XI]US6299362 (GILLILAND PATRICK B [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 4 - column 10; figures 1-6, 9-12 * [I] 2-8,10-16; | [XI]US2006131056 (HACKMAN JOHN A [US]) [X] 1,9 * figures 2-6 * [I] 2-8,10-16 | by applicant | US7303438 | US7448897 | US7175444 |