EP2085571 - Single trip tubing punch and setting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Manufacturing & Services Limited Russell House, Block D Regent Park, Kingston Road Leatherhead KT22 7LU / GB | [2013/46] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Red Spider Technology Limited Peregrine Road Westhill Aberdeen AB32 6JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burnett, William Stephen Burnhead, Laurencekirk Aberdeen AB30 1HN / GB | 02 /
Brown, Irvine Cardno 22 Kirk Crescent North Cults, Aberdeen AB15 9RP / GB | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2013/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Delta House 50 West Nlle Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2010/41] | McKechnie, Neil Henry Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Hope Street Glasgow G2 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2009/32] | Campbell, Arlene Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250175.8 | 22.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | GB20080001730 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: GB 0801730 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2085571 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2085571 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085571 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/112, E21B43/12 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
E21B43/112 (EP,GB,US);
E21B43/11 (GB);
E21B23/00 (EP,US);
E21B43/114 (GB);
E21B43/116 (GB);
E21B43/117 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2017/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein-Arbeitsgang Steigrohrstanz- und Einbauwerkzeug | [2009/32] | English: | Single trip tubing punch and setting tool | [2009/32] | French: | Poinçon de tubes et outil de réglage en une seule manoeuvre | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2009 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 22.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2019 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2009 | AT | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | IT | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | NL | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | IE | 22.01.2020 | LU | 22.01.2020 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | FR | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.01.2009 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
FR | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 25.09.2019 | |
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2328782 (BYNUM PINK T); | [Y]US2381929 (MARCEL SCHLUMBERGER); | [Y]US3720262 (GRABLE D); | [Y]US5195588 (DAVE YOGESH S [US]); | [Y]US5467819 (BRADDICK BRITT O [US]); | [Y]US6554062 (DEWEY CHARLES H [US], et al); | [Y]US2003213590 (BAKKE STIG [NO], et al); | [Y]US2007277980 (GORDON SCOTT ALISTAIR [IE], et al); |