EP2116691 - Method for repairing a stator assembly of a gas turbine engine and gas turbine engine component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/46] | Method for repairing a gas turbine engine component | ||
[2017/38] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasselberg, Timothy P. 726 Town Colony Drive Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 02 /
Rose, William M. 382 Cronin Road West Brookfield Maine 01585 / US | 03 /
Rutz, David A. 74 Sachem Drive Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Hull, James Edward, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/46] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250802.7 | 23.03.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | US20080114836 | 05.05.2008 Original published format: US 114836 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2116691 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2116691 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116691 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/00, B23K9/04 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
B23K9/044 (EP,US);
B23K9/173 (EP,US);
B23P6/007 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
F05D2230/232 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49318 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49726 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49728 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4973 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | F01D5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2013/13] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reparieren einer Statoranordnung einer Gasturbine sowie Gasturbinenbauteil | [2017/38] | English: | Method for repairing a stator assembly of a gas turbine engine and gas turbine engine component | [2017/38] | French: | Procédé de réparation d'un ensemble de stator d'une turbine à gaz et composant d'une turbine à gaz | [2017/38] |
Former [2009/46] | Verfahren zum Reparieren eines Gasturbinenbauteils | ||
Former [2009/46] | Method for repairing a gas turbine engine component | ||
Former [2009/46] | Procédé de réparation d'un composant d'une turbine à gaz | Examination procedure | 07.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 19.01.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Axel Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2019/08] | 15.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.06.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2020 | 28.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.08.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/51] | 22.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4657171 (ROBINS BERTRAND G [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [I]US4903888 (CLARK ROBERT E [US], et al) [I] 1,11 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, lines 7-17 *; | [I]US5553370 (PEPE JOHN [US]) [I] 1-3,5-15 * column 2, lines 28-41; figures 3,4 * * column 4, lines 18-42 *; | [XY]US6468367 (MUKIRA CHARLES GITAHI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 9; figure 1; claim 10 * [Y] 4; | [A]US6568077 (HELLEMANN LESLIE MCLEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 2,3; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1621816 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028]; claim 17 *; | [Y]WO2006125234 (FRONIUS INT GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 4 * the whole document * | Opposition | US4657171 | US4903888 | US5553370 | EP1153699 | US6468367 | US6568077 | WO2005107996 | EP1621816 | EP1674658 | EP1674382 | WO2006125234 | US2007221631 | WO2008027612 | EP2105245 | - OBRITZBERGER GERALD, "Parameter CMT", Fronius QAS Workshop 28/02/2008, (20060100), XP055554069 | - Anonym, "Industrieanzeiger; ''Spritzerfrei und verzugsarm''", Schweisstechnik: VW Sachsen lötet und schweisst mit Cold-Metal-Transfer (CMT | - "Fronius - Füge-Experten im Karosseriebau holen Vorsprung mit CMT- Prozess", Fronius, (20060516), XP055554071 | - GERD TROMMER et al., "Seit 3 Jahren ist mit CMT ein neues Schweißverfahren im Einsatz", CMT-Schweißen, (20080611), XP055554086 | - "CMT: Innovation setzt sich durch", Metall- Internationale Fachzeitschrift für Metall, (20060000), pages 278 - 280, XP055554089 | - KAH, PAUL, "Welding of sheet metal using modified short arc MIG/MAG welding process", (20070424), pages FP - 72, XP055554095 | - BRUCKNER JERGEN, "Cold Metal Transfer Has a Future Joining Steel to Aluminum", Welding Journal, (20050600), vol. 84, no. 6, pages 38 - 40, XP001237082 | - FRONIUS, "Certains I'aiment froid", Weld+version Le Magain De Fronius 2.04, (20040000), pages 1 - 24, XP055554130 | - CAZES ROLAND, "Soudage a I'arc Ref. B7730", Techniques de l'lngenieur, (19950810), pages FP - 28, XP055554147 | - CHABENAT, "Montage des pieces pour soudage a l'arc electrique (BM7610)", Techniques de l'Ingenieur, (20000110), pages 1 - 10, XP055554157 | - "TBA1376 - Le soudage des aciers de construction", Techniques de l'Ingenieur, (20080301), pages 1 - 52, XP055360060 | - MICHEL, ALAIN, "BM5189-Pieces mecaniques soudees-Conception des assemblages", Techniques de l'Ingenieur, (19991010), pages 1 - 39, XP055360073 |