EP2107004 - Damping arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Ltd. Stratford Road Solihull West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | [2019/26] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Ltd. Stratford Road Solihull West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hadley, Kevin Richard Appletree Cottage Sheinton Street Much Wenlock Shropshire TF13 6HZ / GB | 02 /
Connors, David John 130 Longfellow Road Dudley West Mildands DY3 3EH / GB | [2012/51] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Hadley, Kevin Richard Appletree Cottage Sheinton Street Much Wenlock Shropshire TF13 6HZ / GB | ||
02 /
Connors, David John 130 Longfellow Road Dudley West Mildands DY3 3EH / GB | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2013/33] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/51] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 20 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1QZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/41] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250914.0 | 27.03.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | GB20080005829 | 01.04.2008 Original published format: GB 0805829 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107004 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107004 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107004 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2107004 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B64C25/50 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
B64C25/50 (EP,US);
B64C25/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2011/40] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dämpfungsanordnung | [2009/41] | English: | Damping arrangement | [2009/41] | French: | Agencement d'amortisseur | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 03.08.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2013
18.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR Opponent's representative Parzy, Benjamin Alain Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2013
18.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR Opponent's representative Parzy, Benjamin Alain Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | 28.10.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.03.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.09.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.05.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.12.2015 | Appeal received No. T2373/15 | 26.02.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.09.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 26.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.12.2012 | ES | 30.03.2013 | [2014/03] |
Former [2013/23] | ES | 30.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]GB1416806 (DOWTY ROTOL LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 101 * * page 3, lines 31-86; figures 1,2 * [A] 8 [Y] 3,7,9,10; | [X]US2006032976 (BACHMEYER PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2661915 (O'CONNOR BERNARD E) [X] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-6 *; | [YA]US2007241230 (BUCHETON DANIEL [FR], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029]; figure 3 * [A] 1,2; | [YA]US2974905 (RUMSEY ROLLIN D) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 44; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-6; | [YA]EP1574923 (AIRBUS UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * [A] 1-8 | by applicant | US7175134 | US7109679 | GB1416806 | Opposition | US6761243 |