EP2237577 - Location-based messaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Nash, Roger William, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Nash, Roger William, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250967.8 | 31.03.2009 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2237577 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, // H04L29/08 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04N21/25841 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Standortabhängiges Benachrichtigungssystem | [2010/40] | English: | Location-based messaging system | [2010/40] | French: | Système de messagerie basé sur la localisation | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2011/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02071365 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 4, lines 4,5,20-22 * * page 5, lines 1,2,12-20 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 2 * * page 14, line 19 - page 19, line 21 * * page 21, lines 1-14 * * page 22, line 1 - page 24, line 12 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2007270166 (HAMPEL KARL GEORG [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0118] - [0121] ** figures 1,2A,4A-4D * |