EP2151543 - Repair methods for turbines involving conductive heat resistance welding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sullivan, Nicole 329 Meadowbrook Drive Manchester Connecticut, 06042 / US | 02 /
Hughes, John H. P.O. Box 537 Cape Neddick ME 03902-0537 / US | 03 /
Moor, James J. 147 Lakeshore Drive New Hartford Connecticut, 06057 / US | 04 /
Rutz, David A. 74 Sachem Drive Glastonbury Connecticut, 06033 / US | 05 /
Bose, Sudhangshu 28 Patriot Lane Manchester Connecticut, 06040 / UZ | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09250980.1 | 31.03.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | US20080186602 | 06.08.2008 Original published format: US 186602 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2151543 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2151543 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/00, B23P6/04, B23P6/00, B23K9/167, B23K9/04, B23K31/02 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
B23K31/02 (EP,US);
B23K9/04 (EP,US);
B23K9/167 (EP,US);
B23P6/007 (EP,US);
B23P6/045 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | F01D5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2013/30] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reparaturverfahren für Gasturbinen unter Verwendung vom Widerstandschweissen mit Wärmeübertragung durch Leitung | [2010/06] | English: | Repair methods for turbines involving conductive heat resistance welding | [2010/06] | French: | Procédé de réparation pour turbines utilisant une soudure par résistance et conduction de chaleur | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 13.06.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1092497 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0003] *; | [XI]US2007157447 (PREVEY PAUL S [US]) [X] 9 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] * [I] 1-8,10-15; | [A]WO2008046542 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 4 ** figure 1 * | Examination | EP1486286 | by applicant | US6281467 | US6545244 | US7126076 | US7141754 |