EP2106809 - Bioadhesive composition formed using click chemistry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kapiamba, Mbiya 25 Magnolia Hill Court Cromwell, CT 06416 / US | 02 /
Belcheva, Nadya 1742 Aspen Glen Drive Hamden, CT 06518 / US | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/41] | Soames, Candida Jane Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251030.4 | 01.04.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | US20080041303P | 01.04.2008 Original published format: US 41303 P | US20090368415 | 10.02.2009 Original published format: US 368415 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2106809 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2106809 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/04 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
A61L24/043 (EP,US);
A61P41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bioadhäsive Zusammensetzung mit Click-Chemie | [2009/41] | English: | Bioadhesive composition formed using click chemistry | [2009/41] | French: | Composition bioadhésive formée à l'aide de la chimie clic. | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 14.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008031525 (FIDIA FARMACEUTICI [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-14 * claim - * [I] 4,5,9; | [A]WO2006012569 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * Summary of the invention * | [A] - JOHN E MOSES ET AL, "The growing applications of click chemistry", vol. 36, no. 8, doi:10.1039/B613014N, ISSN 0306-0012, (20070101), pages 1249 - 1262, CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, URL: http://pubs.rsc.org/en/Content/ArticleLanding/2007/CS/b613014n, (20070503), XP002667288 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B613014N | by applicant | US5578662 | US2003135238 | US4978336 | US4361055 | US4979942 | US4359049 | US4874368 | US5368563 | US6527749 |