EP2144438 - Television device with user interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony United Kingdom Limited The Heights Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dodd, Kevin Charles 40 The Crofts, Hatch Warren Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4RF / GB | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251062.7 | 09.04.2009 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | GB20080012428 | 07.07.2008 Original published format: GB 0812428 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144438 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/60, H04N5/44 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
H04N5/607 (EP,US);
G09B21/006 (EP,GB,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,GB,US);
H04N21/4221 (EP,US);
H04N21/42215 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fernsehgerät mit Benutzerschnittstelle | [2010/02] | English: | Television device with user interface | [2010/02] | French: | Téléviseur avec interface utilisateur | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US7224410 (GERSTMAN GEORGE H [US]) [Y] 2,5,6,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 4, lines 56-67 *; | [Y]US2003105639 (NAIMPALLY SAIPRASAD V [US], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] *; | [A]US6549718 (GROOTERS BRANDON A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 12-22 * * column 5, lines 18-22 * | [XY] - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC CORPORATION OF AMERICA, "Color Television Operating Instructions", (20031231), URL: http://service.us.panasonic.com/OPERMANPDF/CT27E33.PDF, (20090929), XP002548179 [X] 1,3,7,8,10-12,15 * page 1 * * page 8 * * page 15, column 1 * [Y] 2,4-6,13 | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Panasonic Continues Expansion of Easy Sap Access on Remote Controls", (20031230), URL: http://www.beststuff.com/print/4474, (20090929), XP002548147 [X] 1,3,7,8,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6795011 |