EP2130873 - Room temperature curable organopolysiloxane composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasaki, Isao Silicone-Electronics Materials Research Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Takafumi Silicone-Electronics Materials Research Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Tsuneo Silicone-Electronics Materials Research Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251288.8 | 11.05.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | JP20080126951 | 14.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008126951 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130873 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/14, C08K5/5419 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
C08L83/14 (EP,US);
C08K5/5419 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5419, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bei Raumtemperatur härtbare Organopolysiloxan-Zusammensetzung | [2009/50] | English: | Room temperature curable organopolysiloxane composition | [2009/50] | French: | Composition d'organopolysiloxane durcissable à température ambiante | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007037552 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0304958 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP1104787 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,2 * | by applicant | JPS528854B | JPS6323226B | JP2914838B | JPS6460656 | JP2003221506 |