EP2136189 - Method for analysing vibration in rotor blades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russhard, Peter 9 Brookside Avenue Wollaton Nottingham NG8 2RD / GB | 02 /
Back, Jason David 12 Glendevon Way Chellaston Derby DE73 5WG / GB | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Gunn, Michael Alan Intellectual Property Department WH20 Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 3 Filton Bristol 7QE BS34 7QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251322.5 | 15.05.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | GB20080011073 | 18.06.2008 Original published format: GB 0811073 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2136189 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2136189 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2136189 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
G01H1/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Analyse der Schwingungen in Rotorschaufeln | [2009/52] | English: | Method for analysing vibration in rotor blades | [2009/52] | French: | Méthode d'analyse des vibrations dans des aubes de rotor | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10171193.5 / EP2237002 | EP10171194.3 / EP2237003 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HR | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IT | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | MK | 13.04.2011 | MT | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | IE | 15.05.2011 | LU | 15.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | NO | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
LU | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
LU | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
LU | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4335600 (WU PETER T, et al) [A] 1-4,8-14 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 7; figures 1-2 * * column 4, lines 8-16; claims 1,6,7 *; | [A]US4573358 (LUONGO MICHAEL C [US]) [A] 7 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 14; figure 1 * * column 7, lines 3-55; figures 9-11 *; | [A]US5148711 (TWERDOCHLIB MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 5-6 * column 6, lines 23-63; figure 6 *; | [A]US5206816 (HILL PETER D [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-14 * column 8, line 15, paragraph 9 - column 15, line 25; figures 1,2 * * column 13, line 14 - column 15, line 9; figure 8 *; | [A]WO2004021298 (SEISMIC WARNING SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 5-6 * page 8, lines 19-26; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2866953 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 7 * page 5, line 22 - page 10, line 16; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2007071912 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [A] 7* page 9, line 1 - page 14, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2900745 (EUROCOPTER FRANCE [FR]) [A] 5-6 * page 24; figure 18; claims 1-3 *; | [A] - ZIELINSKI M ET AL, "Noncontact vibration measurements on compressor rotor blades; Rotor blade vibration measurements", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20000701), vol. 11, no. 7, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 847 - 856, XP020062976 [A] 1-4,8-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/11/7/301 | by applicant | US2002162395 |