EP2264476 - Magnetic field sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruigrok, Jaap NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | 02 /
Stegelmann, Jörg NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | 03 /
Van Veldhoven, Robert Henrikus Margaretha NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [2012/06] |
Former [2011/45] | 01 /
Ruigrok, Jaap c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
02 /
Stegelmann, Jörg c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | |||
03 /
Robert Henrikus, Margaretha van c/o NXP Semiconductors Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | |||
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Ruigrok, Jaap c/o NXP Semiconductors, Betchworth House, 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
02 /
Stegelmann, Jörg c/o NXP Semiconductors, Betchworth House, 57-65 Station Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Williamson, Paul Lewis NXP Semiconductors IP Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2010/51] | Williamson, Paul Lewis NXP Semiconductors IP Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251585.7 | 17.06.2009 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264476 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2264476 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/09, G01B7/30, G01D5/14 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01D5/14 (US);
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01R33/0035 (EP,US);
G01R33/07 (EP,US);
G01R33/091 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Magnetfeldsensor | [2010/51] | English: | Magnetic field sensor | [2010/51] | French: | Capteur de champ magnétique | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2009 | AT | 15.02.2012 | BE | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | HR | 15.02.2012 | IT | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | MK | 15.02.2012 | MT | 15.02.2012 | NL | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SE | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | NO | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | ES | 26.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | IE | 17.06.2012 | LU | 17.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MK | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
LU | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MK | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MK | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 15.02.2012 | |
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | DE19722016 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [ ] * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] * * figures 1-7 * * Fig. 3 of DE19722016 *; | [XA]DE10017061 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-10,12,14 [A] 11,13; | [A]US2003090265 (WAN HONG [US], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract * | by applicant | US6212783 |