EP2196319 - System for printing a book on pre-bound pages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revoprint Ltd. 111 Arlozorov Street 62097 Tel Aviv / IL | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sapir-Haim, Roni 3/3 Haavoda Street Kfar Saba 44372 / IL | 02 /
Graff, Ehoud 34 Laskov Street Haifa 34950 / IL | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251767.1 | 09.07.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | IL20080195825 | 09.12.2008 Original published format: IL 19582508 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196319 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2196319 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/28, B41J11/20 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
B41J3/283 (EP);
B41J11/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | System zum Drucken eines Buchs auf vorgebundenen Seiten | [2010/24] | English: | System for printing a book on pre-bound pages | [2010/24] | French: | Système pour imprimer un livre sur des pages pré-reliées | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 29.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2009 | AT | 09.11.2011 | BE | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | HR | 09.11.2011 | IT | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | MK | 09.11.2011 | MT | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | SM | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | NO | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | ES | 20.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | IE | 09.07.2012 | LU | 09.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
SM | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.07.2012 | ||
LU | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
IE | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0503476 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1* column 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 1,2,9-13 *; | [AD]WO2006123338 (HAIM RONI [IL]) [AD] 1 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, line 23; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4029193 | US4776711 | JPH05162485 | US5267799 | US5806991 | US6036381 | US2001022911 | US6762356 | WO2006123338 |